Global Patent Index - EP 0531685 B2

EP 0531685 B2 2002-09-04 - Mineral fillers and pigments containing carbonate

Title (en)

Mineral fillers and pigments containing carbonate

Title (de)

Carbonat-haltige mineralische Füllstoffe und Pigmente

Title (fr)

Charges et pigments minéraux contenant du carbonate

Publication

EP 0531685 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92112697 A

Priority

DE 4128570 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0531685A1] Carbonate-containing mineral fillers, pigments or similar materials are described which are characterised in that they have … …  a) a rhombohedral or substantially circular particle shape, …  b) a steepness factor from 1.1 to 1.4, …  c) a ratio… R = % of the particles < 1 <0>m DIVIDED % of the particles < 0.2 <0>m = 8 to 19… and …  d) a mean statistical particle diameter of 0.4 - 1.5 <0>m. … …<??>These materials can be used in the paper industry both as paper filler and as coating pigment. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/67; D21H 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 32/60 (2017.01); C01F 11/18 (2006.01); C08K 3/00 (2006.01); C08K 3/24 (2006.01); C08K 3/26 (2006.01); C09C 1/02 (2006.01); C09C 3/00 (2006.01); D21H 17/00 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01); D21H 19/00 (2006.01); D21H 19/38 (2006.01); D21H 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 17/675 (2013.01); D21H 17/00 (2013.01); D21H 19/385 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0531685 A1 19930317; EP 0531685 B1 19951213; EP 0531685 B2 20020904; AT 131557 T 19951215; AU 2086192 A 19930304; AU 657341 B2 19950309; DE 4128570 A1 19930304; ES 2083029 T3 19960401; ES 2083029 T5 20030301; JP H0657031 A 19940301; JP H0778147 B2 19950823; KR 960006798 B1 19960523; MX 9204944 A 19930501; NZ 243684 A 19941125; US 5292365 A 19940308; US 5292365 B1 19961001

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110725

2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110725

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-12-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20121207

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59204666

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 131557 T

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-03-06 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100708

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100813

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-03-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-03-14 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2003-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2002-12-11 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2002-09-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1996-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FAXE KALK A/S

- Effective date: 19960913

1996-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2083029 T3

1996-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960217

1996-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59204666 19960125

1995-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO FERRARIO

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1995-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 131557 T 19951215

1994-10-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940907

1993-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930423

1993-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE