Global patent index - EP 0532226 B1

EP 0532226 B1 2000-03-08 - Method and apparatus for encrypting a set of message signals

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for encrypting a set of message signals

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur Verschlüsselung von Informationssignalen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de chiffrage des signaux de message

Publication

EP 0532226 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92307998 A

Priority

US 75931291 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0532226A2] A protocol for authenticating a mobile customer unit to a service provider where signaling messages are encrypted and where voice communications can be encrypted. A service provider assigns to each mobile customer unit a unique "secret", along with other information such as a telephone number. At the pleasure of the service provider, a directive is sent to the mobile customer unit to create a shared secret datum based on the secret. The shared secret datum is created with the aid of a bit string that is sent for that purpose by the provider. A portion of the created shared secret datum is used for encrypting speech and the same or other portion of the created shared secret datum is used as an input to a process for creating a second encryption key. That key is employed in the mobile customer unit to encode those of the control signals generated by the mobile customer unit that affect the nature of the call in progress.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/08; H04L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09C 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/06 (2006.01); H04L 9/08 (2006.01); H04L 9/14 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01); H04W 12/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 12/02 (2013.01); H04L 9/3236 (2013.01); H04L 9/3271 (2013.01); H04L 2209/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5172414 A 19921215; DE 69230741 D1 20000413; DE 69230741 T2 20000817; EP 0532226 A2 19930317; EP 0532226 A3 19940413; EP 0532226 B1 20000308; FI 108690 B 20020228; FI 924092 A0 19920911; FI 924092 A 19930314; JP 2000124897 A 20000428; JP 2000124898 A 20000428; JP 3034706 B2 20000417; JP 3581810 B2 20041027; JP 3667576 B2 20050706; JP H07303101 A 19951114

INPADOC legal status

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120902

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120904

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-09-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20120902

2012-09-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69230741

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69230741

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1997-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970630

1994-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940928

1994-06-22 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: AT&T CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1994-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1993-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE