Global Patent Index - EP 0534556 B1

EP 0534556 B1 2000-06-28 - Fire protection device and storage space provided with a fire protection device

Title (en)

Fire protection device and storage space provided with a fire protection device

Title (de)

Brandschutzvorrichtung und mit dieser ausgestatteter Lagerraum

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre l'incentie et magasin équipé avec ce dispositif

Publication

EP 0534556 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92202921 A

Priority

NL 9101599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0534556A1] Disclosed is a fire protection device (14) which comprises a combination, arranged in series, of at least one flame-arresting element (16) and at least one fire-resisting element (15). The flame-arresting (16) element is intended to prevent flashback of a flame and is preferably made of a metal gauze, a metal grid or a metal foam. The fire-resisting element (15) is preferably designed to automatically block the gas stream through the grid in case of fire, to that end reacts preferably to an increase in temperature, and is preferably made in the form of a honeycomb, Plates, spirals or the like, of a material that foams or swells up in reaction to an increase in temperature and thereby closes off the passages of that element. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/94 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0534556 A1 19930331; EP 0534556 B1 20000628; DE 69231200 D1 20000803; DE 69231200 T2 20001123; NL 9101599 A 19930416

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120925

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120922

2012-10-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20120922

2012-10-03 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20120923

2012-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *SEAC INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20120923

2012-09-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69231200

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-11-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2003-06-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SEAC INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2002-10-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-06-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SEAC INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231200 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

1997-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961218

1993-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930406

1993-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL