Global Patent Index - EP 0536298 B1

EP 0536298 B1 2001-03-07 - METHOD FOR SURFACE FINISHING OF ARTICLES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SURFACE FINISHING OF ARTICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM OBERFLÄCHE-FERTIGBEARBEITEN VON ARTIKELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FINISSAGE D'ARTICLES

Publication

EP 0536298 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91913172 A

Priority

  • US 54370290 A
  • US 9104568 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9200162A1] A method for mechanically finishing parts having the step of agitating a plurality of parts (16) to be finished in contact with a plurality of discrete substantially homogeneous compressed felt chunks (14) having a particulate abrasive material coating (17) thereon.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 31/06; B24B 31/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 31/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 31/14 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9200162 A1 19920109; DE 69132551 D1 20010412; DE 69132551 T2 20011018; EP 0536298 A1 19930414; EP 0536298 A4 19940112; EP 0536298 B1 20010307; ES 2156855 T3 20010801

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080627

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080627

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-03-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MIKRONITE TECHNOLOGIE GROUP INC.

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070716

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-06-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-06-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-06-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-05-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MIKRONITE TECHNOLOGIES GROUP INC.

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2005-01-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MIKRONITE TECHNOLOGIES GROUP INC.

- Free text: H-TECHNOLOGY, INC.#3 MARS COURT#BOONTON, NJ 07005 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MIKRONITE TECHNOLOGIES GROUP INC.#511 WASHINGTON AVENUE#CARLSTADT, NEW JERSEY 07072 (US)

2004-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: H-TECHNOLOGY, INC.

- Free text: HOFFMAN, STEVE, E.#6 MAPLE STREET#ENGLEWOOD CLIFFS, NJ 07632 (US) -TRANSFER TO- H-TECHNOLOGY, INC.#3 MARS COURT#BOONTON, NJ 07005 (US)

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156855 T3

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2001-06-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69132551 20010412

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-02-28 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940520

2000-01-13 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

1999-12-08 [18RR] RE-ESTABLISHED

- Free text: 19991022 ANGENOMMEN

1996-06-12 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 19960416

1996-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 19950419

1994-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940520

1994-01-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19931129

1994-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1993-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930115

1993-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL