Global patent index - EP 0536563 B1

EP 0536563 B1 2000-01-12 - Nuclear inhibitor I-92 and its use for the production of a medicament

Title (en)

Nuclear inhibitor I-92 and its use for the production of a medicament

Title (de)

Kernhemmstoff I-92 und seine Verwendung zur Herstellung eines Arzneimittels

Title (fr)

Inhibiteur nucléaire I-92 et son application à la production d'un médicament

Publication

EP 0536563 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92115730 A

Priority

  • EP 92115730 A
  • EP 91117184 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0536563A1] The present invention concerns a nuclear inhibitor which specifically inhibits the activity of sequence specific DNA enhancer binding proteins of Human Papilloma Virus (HPV) and the use of this nuclear inhibitor for the production of a medicament for treatment of human cervical cancer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 2/00; A61K 38/02; G01N 33/574; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/22 (2006.01); C07K 2/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/005 (2006.01); C07K 14/195 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); G01N 33/577 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4703 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0536563 A1 19930414; EP 0536563 B1 20000112; AT 188706 T 20000115; AU 2627892 A 19930422; AU 669129 B2 19960530; CA 2080182 A1 19930410; CA 2080182 C 20021210; DE 69230550 D1 20000217; DE 69230550 T2 20000525; ES 2140402 T3 20000301; JP H06245787 A 19940906; US 6045831 A 20000404

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070915

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050908

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060915

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DADE BEHRING MARBURG G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060930

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060916

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060915

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060915

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-09-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060916

2006-09-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060915

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050908

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-03-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2140402

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69230550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188706

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6C 07K 2/00 A, 6A 61K 38/02 B, 6G 01N 33/574 B, 6G 01N 33/68 B

1998-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DADE BEHRING MARBURG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEHRING DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950907

1994-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19931209

1993-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE