Global Patent Index - EP 0537790 B2

EP 0537790 B2 2000-07-05 - Connector for flat ribbon cable

Title (en)

Connector for flat ribbon cable

Title (de)

Steckverbinder für Flachbandkabel

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour câble-ruban plat

Publication

EP 0537790 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92117782 A

Priority

DE 4134321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0537790A2] The subject-matter of the invention is a plug connector for flat ribbon cable (3), having a housing upper part (1), consisting of insulating material, in which a number of parallel guide channels (4) for contact elements having insulation-piercing terminals (5), and a transverse groove (2), which passes through the guide channels, for the flat ribbon cable (3) are arranged, and having a housing lower part (10) which consists of insulating material and in which a number of parallel guide channels (11) for contact elements are likewise arranged. In order to create a plug connector which is easy to instal and in which as many contacts as possible can be accommodated and can reliably make contact with one another in a very confined space, it is proposed that the insulation-piercing terminals (5) of the contact elements in the housing upper part (1) be integrally connected to flat blades (6) located in the same plane, that the contact elements in the housing lower part (10) be constructed as fork-spring contacts (12) and be arranged at right angles to the flat blades (6), and that the flat blades (6) and fork-spring contacts (12) engage over one another and make contact with one another in a contact channel (14) which is formed by the housing upper and lower parts (1, 10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 12/67 (2011.01); H01R 12/79 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/79 (2013.01); H01R 12/675 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4134321 C1 19930401; AT 114206 T 19941215; EP 0537790 A2 19930421; EP 0537790 A3 19930714; EP 0537790 B1 19941117; EP 0537790 B2 20000705

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2003-08-15 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STOCKO METALLWARENFABRIKEN HENKELS UND SOHN G.M.B

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021017

2001-10-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-10-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-10-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-09-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-09-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-11-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-10-13 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-09-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-07-05 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

2000-07-05 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/38 A

1995-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KARL LUMBERG GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 19950415

1995-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MOLEX INCORPORATED

- Effective date: 19950816

1995-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KARL LUMBERG GMBH & CO

1995-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MOLEX INCORPORATED

1995-06-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KARL LUMBERG GMBH & CO

- Effective date: 19950415

1994-12-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

1994-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59200786 19941222

1994-12-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1994-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

1994-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 114206 T 19941215

1994-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940315

1993-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930715

1993-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

1993-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL