Global Patent Index - EP 0539537 B2

EP 0539537 B2 2000-12-27 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE IN-LINE NIR MEASUREMENT OF POURABLE FOODSTUFFS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE IN-LINE NIR MEASUREMENT OF POURABLE FOODSTUFFS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IN-LINE NIR-MESSUNG VON SCHÜTTFÄHIGEN NAHRUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE NIR EN LIGNE DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES COULANTS

Publication

EP 0539537 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92908218 A

Priority

  • CH 9200080 W
  • SE 9101220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0511184A1] In analysis of a sample of unground grain, infrared light is directed towards the sample and is detected after reflection on the sample. For analysis of wheat, light wavelengths within the interval 1050-1400 nm are used with a light detector of PbS-type. A suitable infrared analyzer has a rotatable filter device (5) with a plurality of filters (4) within the stated wavelength interval and is disposed to be able to carry out in a short time period a large number of measurements. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/10; G01N 21/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/35 (2006.01); G01N 21/25 (2006.01); G01N 21/47 (2006.01); G01N 21/85 (2006.01); G01N 33/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/10 (2013.01); G01N 21/4738 (2013.01); B07C 2501/0081 (2013.01); G01N 21/3563 (2013.01); Y10S 250/91 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0511184 A1 19921028; EP 0511184 B1 19980624; AT 142787 T 19960915; CN 1044406 C 19990728; CN 1079050 A 19931201; DE 59207108 D1 19961017; DE 69226000 D1 19980730; DE 69226000 T2 19981105; DK 0539537 T3 19970217; DK 0539537 T4 20010514; EP 0539537 A1 19930505; EP 0539537 B1 19960911; EP 0539537 B2 20001227; ES 2092680 T3 19961201; ES 2092680 T5 20010316; JP 3471009 B2 20031125; JP H05508225 A 19931118; RU 2092817 C1 19971010; SE 468334 B 19921214; SE 9101220 D0 19910423; SE 9101220 L 19921024; US 5308981 A 19940503; US 5406084 A 19950411; WO 9218864 A1 19921029

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080423

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080424

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080423

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080424

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080423

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080423

2008-12-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BUHLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PERTEN PETER

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070404

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070616

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-04-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-03-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-03-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-03-07 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070307

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-01-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-11-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-04-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-14 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2001-04-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010402

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-03-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-03-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-02-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-12-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LUEBBE GMBH

1997-07-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BRAN + LUEBBE GMBH

- Effective date: 19970611

1997-02-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1996-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2092680 T3

1996-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19961010

1996-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59207108 19961017

1996-10-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PERTEN, PETER * TOBLER, HANS

1996-09-13 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Free text: BUEHLER AG;PERTEN, HANS TRANSFER- BUEHLER AG;PERTEN, PETER

1996-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 142787 T 19960915

1996-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1996-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PERTEN, PETER

1996-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOBLER, HANS

1995-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950807

1993-05-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19921207

1993-05-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE