Global Patent Index - EP 0541547 B1

EP 0541547 B1 2000-03-29 - NOVEL HYDROCARBON FUEL, ITS PREPARATION AND USE

Title (en)

NOVEL HYDROCARBON FUEL, ITS PREPARATION AND USE

Title (de)

NEUER KOHLENWASSERSTOFF-BRENNSTOFF, METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU CARBURANT AUX HYDROCARBURES, METHODE DE PREPARATION ET UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0541547 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 90916967 A

Priority

US 9004201 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9202600A1] A liquid hydrocarbon gasoline is provided by removing both the volatile and non-volatile components from C4-C12 gasoline to yield either a C6-C9 or a C6-C10 intermediate gasoline. The intermediate gasoline of this invention can be combusted in a stndard carbureted engine with less C4 and/or C5 priming than is required in standard C4-C12 gasoline, and thus provides adequate cold engine starting ability with lower Reid Vapor Pressure. The C6-C9 and C6-C10 fuel can be combusted in a modified engine without any priming by gasiying the fuel. The fuel is gasified by heating it in a chamber in the absence of air; mixing the gas with air and then combusting the mixture. The gasified fuel is advantageous because it doesn't condense into droplets and thereby is combusted more completely in the gaseous state enhancing combustion efficiency. The fuels of this invention better facilitate alcohol addition than current gasolines because of their lower Reid Vapor Pressures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/06; C10L 1/18; C10L 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/02 (2006.01); C10L 1/06 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/182 (2006.01); C10L 10/14 (2006.01); F02B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/023 (2013.01); F02B 41/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9202600 A1 19920220; AT 191233 T 20000415; AU 657467 B2 19950316; AU 6729690 A 19920302; BR 9008035 A 19930629; CA 2088044 A1 19920201; CA 2088044 C 20030211; DE 69033497 D1 20000504; DE 69033497 T2 20010118; DE 69033497 T3 20050630; EP 0541547 A1 19930519; EP 0541547 A4 19930728; EP 0541547 B1 20000329; EP 0541547 B2 20041103; ES 2146575 T3 20000816; ES 2146575 T5 20050601; HU T66537 A 19941228; JP 3202747 B2 20010827; JP H06501966 A 19940303

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2008-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070801

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-07-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060705

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-03-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1013663

2005-12-23 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-06-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-11-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146575 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000629

2000-06-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69033497 20000504

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191233 T 20000415

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TALBERT FUEL SYSTEMS, INC.

1998-04-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TALBERT FUEL SYSTEMS PATENTS CO.

1994-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940303

1993-07-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19930608

1993-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1993-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1993-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930129

1993-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE