EP 0543087 A3 19940504 -
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 9114492 U 19911121
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0543087A2] The invention relates to a protection device for an electroacoustic transducer, particularly a microphone transducer, consisting of a protection body of sintered material at least partially surrounding the electroacoustic transducer.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H04R 1/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 1/08 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H04R 1/086 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [YA] US 4903249 A 19900220 - HOOPS RICHARD H [US], et al
- [A] US 4600077 A 19860715 - DREVER LESLIE C [US]
- [PX] DE 9114492 U1 19920130
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 17 (C - 796) 14 January 1991 (1991-01-14)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 214 (C - 362) 25 July 1986 (1986-07-25)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 177 (C - 829) 7 May 1991 (1991-05-07)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 9114492 U1 19920130; EP 0543087 A2 19930526; EP 0543087 A3 19940504; JP H05252583 A 19930928
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 9114492 U 19911121; EP 92113624 A 19920810; JP 23815692 A 19920907