Global Patent Index - EP 0543176 B1

EP 0543176 B1 2000-01-12 - Intrusion alarm system

Title (en)

Intrusion alarm system

Title (de)

Einbruchmeldeanlage

Title (fr)

Installation de signalisation d'intrusion

Publication

EP 0543176 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 92118194 A

Priority

DE 4138101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0543176A1] The invention relates to an intrusion alarm system with a central intrusion alarm station and an operating unit which can be connected to the central intrusion alarm station. Such operating units must be designed to be very rugged for protection against sabotage attacks and environmental influences, and thus be very costly. The invention is based on the object of creating an intrusion alarm system which has a simple equipment structure and provides safety against sabotage attacks and atmospheric influences. This object is achieved by the fact that the operating unit is mobile and is only temporarily connected to the central intrusion alarm station and that the connection between operating unit and central station is formed by a contactless transmitting/receiving device or by a galvanic contact interface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0543176 A1 19930526; EP 0543176 B1 20000112; AT 188796 T 20000115; DE 4138101 C1 19930609

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59209797

2012-10-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59209797

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091023

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NOVAR GMBH

- Free text: EFF-EFF ALARM GMBH#JOHANNES-MAUTHE-STRASSE 14#72458 ALBSTADT-EBINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NOVAR GMBH#JOHANNES-MAUTHE-STRASSE 14#72458 ALBSTADT-EBINGEN (DE)

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2001-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FRITZ FUSS GMBH & CO. TRANSFER- EFF-EFF ALARM GMBH

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL & PARTNER AG PATENTBUERO

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59209797 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188796 T 20000115

1997-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970221

1994-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931126

1993-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL