Global patent index - EP 0543815 B1

EP 0543815 B1 2000-01-05 - ADJUSTABLE WRENCH

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE WRENCH

Title (de)

EINSTELLBARER SCHRAUBENSCHLÜSSEL

Title (fr)

CLE REGLABLE

Publication

EP 0543815 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 91904356 A

Priority

  • US 9100709 W
  • US 56729090 A
  • US 63882891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9203261A1] An adjustable wrench having a housing (12) with a handle (14) and having a plurality of jaws (70) that extend out the bottom of the housing and move radially with respect to one another. The housing (12) contains a control disk (28) which may be locked to the housing (12) to prevent the jaws (70) from turning with respect to the housing (12). A jaw (70) adjusting disk (80) is disposed beneath the control disk (28) and extends out the bottom of the housing (12). The adjusting disk (80) contains cams (92, 100) that open and close the jaws (70) depending upon the direction of rotation of the adjusting disk (80).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/44 (2006.01); B25B 13/46 (2006.01); B25B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/004 (2013.01); B25B 13/44 (2013.01); B25B 13/463 (2013.01); B25B 13/466 (2013.01); B25B 13/467 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9203261 A1 19920305; DE 69131896 D1 20000210; DE 69131896 T2 20000615; EP 0543815 A1 19930602; EP 0543815 A4 19940330; EP 0543815 B1 20000105; ES 2140387 T3 20000301

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-02-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020202

2002-02-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-02-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-02-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-01-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2140387

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-02-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69131896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1995-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950530

1994-03-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19940209

1994-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1993-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19930224

1993-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE