Global Patent Index - EP 0543929 B2

EP 0543929 B2 2000-05-24 - WATER RIDE WITH WATER PROPULSION DEVICES

Title (en)

WATER RIDE WITH WATER PROPULSION DEVICES

Title (de)

WASSERRUTSCHBAHN MIT WASSERTREIBSTRAHLVORRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

TOBOGGAN A PROPULSION AQUATIQUE

Publication

EP 0543929 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 91916366 A

Priority

  • US 9105783 W
  • US 56827890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9203201A1] A method and apparatus for controllably injecting, subsequent to the start of a water ride, a high velocity water flow (30) over the water ride surface (25). A rider (29) (or vehicle) that rides into such injected flow (30), as a result of water-to-rider momentum transfer, either be accelerated, matched, or decelerated in a downhill, horizontal or uphill straight or curvilinear direction by such injected flow (30). Flow emitting nozzles (24) can be either positioned above, along side, or from any position along the length of the water ride surface (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63G 21/18; A63C 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/10 (2006.01); A63G 21/18 (2006.01); E04H 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/0006 (2013.01); A63G 21/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9203201 A1 19920305; AT 143282 T 19961015; AU 655437 B2 19941222; AU 8526891 A 19920317; CA 2089580 A1 19920216; CA 2089580 C 20030708; DE 69122400 D1 19961031; DE 69122400 T2 19970213; DE 69122400 T3 20001228; DK 0543929 T3 19970317; DK 0543929 T4 20001204; EP 0543929 A1 19930602; EP 0543929 A4 19930804; EP 0543929 B1 19960925; EP 0543929 B2 20000524; ES 2093712 T3 19970101; ES 2093712 T5 20001016; GR 3021330 T3 19970131; GR 3034027 T3 20001130; JP 2833863 B2 19981209; JP H06500484 A 19940120; SG 45213 A1 19980116

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110816

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100816

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110815

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100816

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-08-24 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20110815

2011-08-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69122400

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100815

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LOCHTEFELD THOMAS J.

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090813

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090902

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-23 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2000-12-04 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2000-11-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-10-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-04 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-07-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-06-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-05-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LOTEC B.V.

1997-08-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LOTEC B.V.

- Effective date: 19970624

1997-03-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1997-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2093712 T3

1996-12-31 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Free text: 3021330

1996-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69122400 19961031

1996-10-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1996-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 143282 T 19961015

1994-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940627

1993-08-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19930615

1993-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1993-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930309

1993-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE