Global Patent Index - EP 0547759 B1

EP 0547759 B1 2000-03-15 - Non supervisor-mode cross-address space dynamic linking

Title (en)

Non supervisor-mode cross-address space dynamic linking

Title (de)

Dynamische Programmverknüpfung zwischen Programmadressbereichen im Nicht-Überwachungsmodus

Title (fr)

Etablissement de liens dynamiques entre des espaces d'adresses en mode non-superviseur

Publication

EP 0547759 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92310330 A

Priority

US 80966891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0547759A2] In a network of object oriented distributed systems, a plurality of program code managers, each having access to a plurality of program code segment objects, a plurality of address space managers, each having access to a plurality of address space objects having linked program segment and symbol address information, and a plurality of trusted third party authentication managers are provided, thereby allowing a client process executing in non-supervisor mode to be able to dynamically link a program segment to either another program segment in another address space or a process in either another address space or the client's address space, without compromising the security of the systems. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/445; G06F 9/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/06 (2006.01); G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 9/445 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44521 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Gingell et al. "Shared libraries in SunOs" Proc. of the summer USENIX Conf., Berkeley, USA, 1987, pages 131-145

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0547759 A2 19930623; EP 0547759 A3 19941109; EP 0547759 B1 20000315; DE 69230778 D1 20000420; DE 69230778 T2 20001026; JP 3391037 B2 20030331; JP H05324282 A 19931207; US 5359721 A 19941025

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051112

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041112

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041112

2003-11-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031112

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69230778 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980210

1995-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950411

1994-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1993-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT