Global Patent Index - EP 0548054 B1

EP 0548054 B1 2002-12-11 - Voice activity detector

Title (en)

Voice activity detector

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Feststellung der Anwesenheit von Sprachlauten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection de la présence d'un signal de parole

Publication

EP 0548054 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93200015 A

Priority

  • EP 89302422 A
  • GB 8805795 A
  • GB 8813346 A
  • GB 8820105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0335521A1] Voice activity detector (VAD) for use in an LPC coder in a mobile radio system, uses autocorrelation coefficients R0, R1..... of the input signal, weighted and combined, to provide a measure M which depends on the power within that part of the spectrum containing no noise, which is thresholded against a variable threshold to provide a speech/no speech logic output. The measure is <MATH> where Hi are the autocorrelation coefficients of the impulse response of an Nth order FIR inverse noise filter derived from LPC analysis of previous non-speech signal frames. Threshold adaption and coefficient update are controlled by a second VAD responsive to rate of spectral change between frames.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/00 (2013.01); G10L 25/78 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 25/00 (2013.01); G10L 25/78 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0335521 A1 19891004; EP 0335521 B1 19931124; AU 3355489 A 19891005; AU 608432 B2 19910328; BR 8907308 A 19910319; CA 1335003 C 19950328; DE 68910859 D1 19940105; DE 68910859 T2 19941208; DE 68929442 D1 20030123; DE 68929442 T2 20031002; DK 175478 B1 20041108; DK 215690 A 19900907; DK 215690 D0 19900907; EP 0548054 A2 19930623; EP 0548054 A3 19940112; EP 0548054 B1 20021211; ES 2047664 T3 19940301; ES 2188588 T3 20030701; FI 110726 B 20030314; FI 115328 B 20050415; FI 20010933 A 20010504; FI 904410 A0 19900907; HK 135896 A 19960802; IE 61863 B1 19941130; IE 890774 L 19890911; JP 2000148172 A 20000526; JP 3321156 B2 20020903; JP 3423906 B2 20030707; JP H03504283 A 19910919; KR 0161258 B1 19990320; NO 304858 B1 19990222; NO 903936 A 19901109; NO 903936 D0 19900910; NO 982568 A 19901109; NO 982568 D0 19980604; NZ 228290 A 19920129; PT 89978 A 19891110; PT 89978 B 19950301; WO 8908910 A1 19890921

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090309

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20090310

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090311

2009-05-06 [NLV7] NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20090310

2009-04-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20090309

2009-03-31 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *LG ELECTRONICS INC.

- Effective date: 20090310

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-05-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080305

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080303

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-10-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1013496

2004-04-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LG ELECTRONICS INC.

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188588 T3

2003-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68929442 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 335521

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229683 T 20021215

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 11/02 A

1997-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970716

1994-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1993-10-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930817

1993-06-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 335521

1993-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE