Global Patent Index - EP 0548103 B1

EP 0548103 B1 2001-12-05 - USE OF PYRIDYLMETHYLSULPHINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATES IN THE TREATMENT OF ILLNESSES CAUSED BY HELICOBACTER BACTERIA

Title (en)

USE OF PYRIDYLMETHYLSULPHINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATES IN THE TREATMENT OF ILLNESSES CAUSED BY HELICOBACTER BACTERIA

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON PYRIDYLMETHYLSULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOL DERIVATEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DURCH HELICOBACTER VERURSACHTER ERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE DERIVES DE PYRIDYLMETHYLSULFINYL-1H-BENZIMIDAZOL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES PROVOQUEES PAR HELICOBACTER

Publication

EP 0548103 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 91914905 A

Priority

  • CH 222691 A
  • CH 299390 A
  • EP 9101689 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9204898A1] The invention concerns the use of compound of formula (I), in which the substituents and symbols are as defined in the specification, against Helicobacter bacteria.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07D 491/056 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/44 (2013.01); A61K 31/70 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/70 + A61K 31/44
  2. A61K 31/44 + A61K 31/43
  3. A61K 31/44 + A61K 31/42
  4. A61K 31/44 + A61K 31/415
  5. A61K 31/44 + A61K 31/345
  6. A61K 31/44 + A61K 2300/00
  7. A61K 31/70 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9204898 A1 19920402; AT 209914 T 20011215; AU 8445791 A 19920415; CA 2092694 A1 19920315; CA 2092694 C 20050405; CY 2363 B1 20040604; DE 59109225 D1 20020117; DK 0548103 T3 20020402; EP 0548103 A1 19930630; EP 0548103 B1 20011205; ES 2169022 T3 20020701; IE 913232 A1 19920225; IL 99471 A 19960331; IL 99471 D0 19920818; JP H06500547 A 19940120; NZ 239772 A 19970324

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110907

2013-08-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130806

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110907

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110905

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: NYCOMED G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-09-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20110905

2011-09-26 [REG DK EUP] EP PATENT EXPIRED

2011-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-14 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-09-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59109225

2011-09-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59109225

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100916

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NYCOMED GMBH

- Free text: NYCOMED GMBH#BYK-GULDEN-STRASSE 2#78467 KONSTANZ (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NYCOMED GMBH#BYK-GULDEN-STRASSE 2#78467 KONSTANZ (DE)

2008-04-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-04-18 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2007-12-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: NYCOMED GMBH

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NYCOMED GMBH

- Free text: ALTANA PHARMA AG#BYK-GULDEN-STRASSE 2#78403 KONSTANZ (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NYCOMED GMBH#BYK-GULDEN-STRASSE 2#78467 KONSTANZ (DE)

2003-01-06 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALTANA PHARMA AG

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ALTANA PHARMA AG

2002-09-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALTANA PHARMA AG

2002-08-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEMISCHE FABRIK GMBH TRANSFER- ALTANA PHARMA AG

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020400839

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169022 T3

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BYK AG

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59109225 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 209914 T 20011215

1995-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951023

1993-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930219

1993-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE