Global Patent Index - EP 0549816 B2

EP 0549816 B2 2000-07-19 - Grid rod for the construction of a grid

Title (en)

Grid rod for the construction of a grid

Title (de)

Rostbodenelement zum Aufbau eines Rostbodens

Title (fr)

Elément de grille pour la construction d'un grille

Publication

EP 0549816 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91115207 A

Priority

EP 91115207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0549816A1] The invention relates to a grid rod (8) for the construction of a grid, comprising two side webs (12, 14) arranged at a spacing from one another as well as, arranged one behind another between these side webs in the longitudinal direction of the same, a number of lamellar bodies (6), between which a gas blow-out slot (34) is left in each case. The side webs (12, 14) are formed by two mutually opposite legs of a rigid frame (2), and the lamellar bodies (6) are designed in each case as individual components which can be detachably connected to the side webs (12, 14). The lamellar bodies (6) are preferably threaded one behind another into longitudinal guides (18, 20) arranged on the frame and are held by spacing projections (30, 32) at a distance which is necessary for forming a gas blow-out slot (34). …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 15/02; F27B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27D 1/06 (2006.01); F23H 1/00 (2006.01); F23H 13/00 (2006.01); F27B 21/02 (2006.01); F27D 1/12 (2006.01); F27D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 15/022 (2013.01); F27B 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0549816 A1 19930707; EP 0549816 B1 19970122; EP 0549816 B2 20000719; AT 148218 T 19970215; AU 2283592 A 19930311; AU 655060 B2 19941201; BR 9203481 A 19930413; CA 2077724 A1 19930310; CA 2077724 C 20000411; CN 1060858 C 20010117; CN 1072487 A 19930526; CZ 280893 B6 19960515; CZ 9202685 A3 19930714; DE 59108512 D1 19970306; DK 0549816 T3 19970728; DK 0549816 T4 20000918; ES 2097172 T3 19970401; ES 2097172 T5 20001016; HU 213426 B 19970630; HU 9202871 D0 19921228; HU T62409 A 19930428; JP 2961469 B2 19991012; JP H06281354 A 19941007; KR 100209922 B1 19990715; MX 9205144 A 19930701; PL 169153 B1 19960628; PL 295854 A1 19930823; RU 2079789 C1 19970520; TR 26157 A 19950215; US 5299555 A 19940405

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110910

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100910

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *IKN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110909

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-26 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

2011-09-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59108512

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100909

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100909

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100909

2011-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090924

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070909

2006-09-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2004-01-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-12-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: IKN GMBH

- Free text: ABRASION ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED#SECOND FLOOR, SIR WALTER RALEIGH HOUSE, 48-50 THE ESPLANADE, ST. HELIER#JERSEY, CHANNEL ISLANDS JE2 3QB (GB) -TRANSFER TO- IKN GMBH#MITTELSTRASSE 4-5#31535 NEUSTADT (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LENZI & C.

2000-10-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-09-22 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-09-18 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2000-09-13 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-08-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-07-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 19980401

1998-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980401

1998-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KRUPP POLYSIUS AG

1997-11-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KRUPP POLYSIUS AG

- Effective date: 19970926

1997-07-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1997-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970407

1997-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: 0508;45RMFLENZI & C.

1997-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2097172 T3

1997-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

1997-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59108512 19970306

1997-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1997-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 148218 T 19970215

1994-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19931228

1993-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19920612

1993-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE