Global Patent Index - EP 0550026 B2

EP 0550026 B2 2000-03-01 - Methods and combinations for sealing corked bottles

Title (en)

Methods and combinations for sealing corked bottles

Title (de)

Verfahren sowie Mittel zum Abdichten von gekorkten Flaschen

Title (fr)

Procédés et moyens pour étancher des bouteilles bouchées

Publication

EP 0550026 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 92121964 A

Priority

  • US 81486391 A
  • US 84223792 A
  • US 89737092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0550026A1] A disc (10,30) made of thermoplastic material is inserted into the neck of a corked bottle and placed upon the top of the cork so that when the disc is partially melted, it forms a water resistant seal with the interior surface of the bottle neck and the cork. In forming the seal, the entire disc (10,30) remains inside the bottle neck leaving the exterior of the bottle free from messy or harmful residue. The interior surface of the bottle neck may be straight (12) or beveled (50) at an obtuse angle. If the interior surface of the bottle neck is beveled, a disc with a frusto conical configuration (30) is used in the method. A cover layer can be adhered to the top of the wax disc for ornamentation and labeling purposes. A liquified thermoplastic material (130) is injected into the neck of a corked bottle and placed upon the top of the cork (114) so that when the thermoplastic material hardens, it forms a water resistant seal with the interior surface of the bottle neck and the cork. In forming the seal, the entire thermoplastic material remains inside the bottle neck leaving the exterior of the bottle free from messy or harmful residue. The bottle neck further comprises a groove (124) around the interior surface near the mouth. A cover layer (132) can be snapped into the groove such that it lays on top of the thermoplastic material for ornamentation and labeling purposes and to further secure the cork in place within the bottle neck. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 5/00; B67B 5/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/00 (2006.01); B67B 5/00 (2006.01); B67B 5/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/0058 (2013.01); B65D 39/00 (2013.01); B65D 39/0011 (2013.01); B67B 5/00 (2013.01); B67B 5/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0550026 A1 19930707; EP 0550026 B1 19950621; EP 0550026 B2 20000301; AT 124016 T 19950715; DE 69203086 D1 19950727; DE 69203086 T2 19960111; DE 69203086 T3 20001012; ES 2075584 T3 19951001; ES 2075584 T5 20000801; GR 3017356 T3 19951231

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061226

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061226

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061223

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061223

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-08-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-07-21 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-05-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-01 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 19970630

1997-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

1997-07-30 [REG GR MM2A] ANNULMENT OR LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM2A

- Free Format Text: 3017356

1997-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970630

1997-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19970630

1996-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19961231

1996-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19961231

1996-12-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19961223

1996-05-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KUHN & SIEFERT GMBH & CO KG

- Effective date: 19960318

1996-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

1995-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19951231

1995-12-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19951222

- Year of fee payment: 4

1995-12-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19951221

- Year of fee payment: 4

1995-12-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19951219

- Year of fee payment: 4

1995-12-14 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19951214

- Year of fee payment: 4

1995-11-30 [REG GR FG4A] VALIDATION IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4A

- Free Format Text: 3017356

1995-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1995-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2075584

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1995-09-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19950921

1995-09-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69203086

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-07-27

1995-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-06-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19950621

1995-06-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19950621

1995-06-21 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19950621

1995-06-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19950621

1995-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 124016

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1994-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19940502

1994-03-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940106

1993-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL PT SE