Global Patent Index - EP 0550055 B1

EP 0550055 B1 2000-01-26 - Method for monitoring a heater

Title (en)

Method for monitoring a heater

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Überwachung eines Heizgerätes

Title (fr)

Procédé pour surveiller un dispositif de chauffage

Publication

EP 0550055 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 92122091 A

Priority

AT 256891 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0550055A1] Method for monitoring a fireplace-mounted heater arranged in an installation room with a burner which is arranged in a combustion chamber, in which the escape of waste gas into the installation room is detected and the burner is subsequently switched off and, after a predetermined time, in the event of a heat requirement existing, an attempt is made to switch the burner on again. In order on the one hand to make possible continued operation of the device on the occurrence of a temporary fault and on the other hand to prevent a risk as a result of a dangerous rise in the concentration of harmful substances in the installation room of the device, it is envisaged that, after a predetermined number of attempts to switch on again, the burner is finally switched off. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/00; F23N 5/02; F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/002 (2013.01); F23N 5/022 (2013.01); F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 2023/28 (2013.01); F23N 2025/10 (2013.01); F23N 2025/13 (2013.01); F23N 2027/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0550055 A1 19930707; EP 0550055 B1 20000126; AT 189300 T 20000215; AT 400756 B 19960325; AT A256891 A 19950715; DE 4244428 A1 19930701; DE 4244428 C2 20030710; DE 59209803 D1 20000302; ES 2143984 T3 20000601

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071229

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071229

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-12-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-11-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061107

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-10-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JOH. VAILLANT G.M.B.H. U. CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAILLANT N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAILLANT S.A.R.L

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAILLANT G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAILLANT LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAILLANT B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: VAILLANT A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-07-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-06-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143984

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59209803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189300

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOH. VAILLANT GMBH U. CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT S.A.R.L

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAILLANT A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950512

1994-03-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19931228

1993-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE