Global patent index - EP 0550423 B1

EP 0550423 B1 2000-01-26 - Drum washing machine with means for discharging the laundry

Title (en)

Drum washing machine with means for discharging the laundry

Title (de)

Trommelwaschmaschine mit Vorrichtung zum Entladen von Wäsche

Title (fr)

Machine à laver à tambour avec dispositif pour décharger le linge

Publication

EP 0550423 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93250070 A

Priority

  • EP 89730040 A
  • JP 1558089 A
  • JP 4051388 A
  • JP 6128188 A
  • JP 13976688 U
  • JP 18866188 A
  • JP 22741888 A
  • JP 30694288 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0343096A2] A drum type washing apparatus and a method of processing the wash using the drum type washing apparatus wherein they have a characterizing feature which consists in that the peripheral wall of a rotary drum made of a perforated plate is configured in the form of a wall having a single corrugated portion or a plurality of corrugated portions which do not intersect the direction of centrifugal force generated by rotation of the rotary drum at right angles. Further, they have other characterizing features which consist in that the apparatus is provided with a liquid injecting nozzle and/or a gas blowing nozzle and/or a hot air blowing nozzle for allowing liquid and/or gas and/or hot air to be injected and/or blown into the interior of the rotary drum whereby a period of time required for performing steps of washing, dewatering and drying the wash in the rotary drum can be shortened. Moreover, they have another characterizing feature which consists in that the rotary drum is rotated and air is blown into the interior of the rotary drum while a door is kept opened so that the wash can be discharged from the rotary drum at a high efficiency under the influence of force generated by flowing of the air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/02; D06F 25/00; D06F 39/08; D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 25/00 (2006.01); D06F 37/02 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01); D06F 58/02 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/088 (2013.01); D06F 25/00 (2013.01); D06F 37/02 (2013.01); D06F 58/02 (2013.01); D06F 95/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0343096 A2 19891123; EP 0343096 A3 19900418; EP 0343096 B1 19990818; DE 68928139 D1 19970724; DE 68928139 T2 19971204; DE 68928640 D1 19980514; DE 68928640 T2 19990311; DE 68929057 D1 19990923; DE 68929057 T2 20000203; DE 68929146 D1 20000302; DE 68929146 T2 20000706; EP 0548063 A2 19930623; EP 0548063 A3 19931215; EP 0548063 B1 19970618; EP 0548064 A2 19930623; EP 0548064 A3 19931215; EP 0548064 B1 19980408; EP 0550423 A2 19930707; EP 0550423 A3 19940112; EP 0550423 B1 20000126; KR 920004722 B1 19920615; US 5050259 A 19910924; US 5107606 A 19920428

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050221

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2002-10-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-02-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-02-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2000-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2000-04-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 68929146

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 343096

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950714

1994-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1993-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930721

1993-07-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 343096

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1993-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT