Global patent index - EP 0550649 B2

EP 0550649 B2 2000-03-01 - DEVICE FOR MONITORING PORTABLE BREATHING APPARATUS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MONITORING PORTABLE BREATHING APPARATUS

Title (de)

ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MOBILE ATEMGERÄTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE D'APPAREILS PORTATIFS DE RESPIRATION

Publication

EP 0550649 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 91918293 A

Priority

  • DE 4033292 A
  • EP 9101982 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4033292A1] The mobile respirator monitor contains a pressure sensor for the respirator pressure containers, a transmitter of signals corresp. to the pressure measuring at intervals, a receiver, and a display showing symbols or numbers derived from the received signals. - The transmitter contains an identification signal generator, which is transmitted at least once during each transmission interval and compared in the receiver with a stored identification signal. Received signals are only processed on the signal coincidence.

[origin: DE4033292A1] A monitoring device for portable breathing apparatus has a manometer that detects the pressure in the pressure reservoir (5) of the breathing apparatus and an emitter (2) that emits at regular intervals a signal that corresponds to the pressure. The emitter further has a signal generator that generates an identification signal charactheristic for the emitter. The pressure signal and the identification signal are received and checked by a receiver (3). When the identification signal matches an identification comparison signal stored in the receiver, the pressure measurement value is displayed on a display (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 11/32; B63C 11/02; B63C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/00 (2006.01); B63C 9/00 (2006.01); B63C 11/02 (2006.01); B63C 11/22 (2006.01); B63C 11/32 (2006.01); G08B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 11/32 (2013.01); B63C 9/0005 (2013.01); B63C 2011/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9206889 A1 19920430; DE 4033292 A1 19920423; EP 0550649 A1 19930714; EP 0550649 B1 19940504; EP 0550649 B2 20000301; ES 2056662 T3 19941001; ES 2056662 T5 20000716; JP H06504245 A 19940519; US 5392771 A 19950228; US 5738092 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111019

2013-08-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111019

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20111017

2012-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 105246

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111018

2011-11-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20111017

2011-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-10-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59101589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-10-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59101589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-09-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: UWATEC AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-08-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2000-07-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-06-30 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-05-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-03-01 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-10-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BEUCHAT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH * 950203 COCHRAN CONSULTI

- Effective date: 19950203

1997-10-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BEUCHAT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH * 950203 COCHRAN CONSULTI

- Effective date: 19950203

1995-03-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BEUCHAT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 19950203

1995-03-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: COCHRAN CONSULTING INC.

- Effective date: 19950203

1994-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2056662

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1994-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19940815

1994-07-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1994-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1994-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59101589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1994-06-09

1994-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1994-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 105246

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1994-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1993-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19930823

1993-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UWATEC AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1993-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19930414

1993-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI