Global Patent Index - EP 0555710 B1

EP 0555710 B1 2000-05-31 - Liquid transfer device for a clinical analyser

Title (en)

Liquid transfer device for a clinical analyser

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitstransfereinrichtung für ein Analysegerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert de liquide pour appareil d'analyse

Publication

EP 0555710 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93101471 A

Priority

DE 4203638 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0555710A2] Liquids transfer device for an analyser, having a capacitive liquid-level detector (10) for detecting the immersion of a liquid-transfer needle (5) into an analysis liquid (4). A more reliable function, especially an improved ratio between the useful signal and noise signals, is achieved by the liquid transfer needle (5) forming part of a coaxial electrode arrangement (11) which, in addition to the liquid transfer needle (5) includes at least one coaxial electrode (12,13), which surrounds the needle and is insulated therefrom, and by the detection circuit (17), which serves to detect a change of the capacity between the electrodes (5,13) of the liquid level detector (10), having a voltage follower circuit (23), connected to whose input (23a) and output (23b) there are two adjacent electrodes (5,12) of the coaxial electrode arrangement (11) as a signal electrode and a compensation electrode, so that no voltage differential arises between the signal electrode and the compensation electrode. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 35/10; G01F 23/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/26 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/1009 (2013.01); G01F 23/263 (2013.01); G01F 23/266 (2013.01); G01F 23/268 (2013.01); G01N 2035/1025 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • US 3754444 A 19730828 - URE S, et al
  • GB 2245707 A 19920108 - SYCOPEL SCIENT LTD [GB]
  • RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, NO. 254, June 1985, pages 296-299, disclosure no. 25430, Emsworth, Hampshire, GB 'Niveau-Fühlanordnung für Pipettiervorrichtung'

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0555710 A2 19930818; EP 0555710 A3 19950208; EP 0555710 B1 20000531; DE 4203638 A1 19930812; ES 2147734 T3 20001001; JP H05340789 A 19931221; JP H07119642 B2 19951220; US 5304347 A 19940419

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2011-03-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110310

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100130

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090106

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

- Free text: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH# #68298 MANNHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH# #68298 MANNHEIM (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147734 T3

2000-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-07-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310050 20000706

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 35/10 A, 7G 01F 23/26 B

1999-03-17 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH

1997-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970103

1995-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1993-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930130

1993-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE