Global Patent Index - EP 0556081 B2

EP 0556081 B2 2001-12-19 - Brush for applying nail polish or similar products

Title (en)

Brush for applying nail polish or similar products

Title (de)

Pinsel zum Anbringen von Nagellack oder ähnlichen Produkten

Title (fr)

Pinceau pour l'application de vernis à ongles, ou de produit similaire

Publication

EP 0556081 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 93400196 A

Priority

FR 9201498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0556081A1] The brush comprises hairs (2a, 2b) which are arranged substantially parallel to one another and secured as a tuft on a support. The hairs consist of a mixture of hairs (2a) of small section, or small hairs, and hairs (2b) which have a larger section, or thick hairs, the proportion of thick hairs being between 2 % and 95 % by volume in relation to the total volume of the tuft of the brush. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A46B 3/22 (2006.01); A46B 9/06 (2006.01); A46D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/06 (2013.01); Y10S 15/06 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

US 3153800 A 19641027 - ETIENNE TROTIN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0556081 A1 19930818; EP 0556081 B1 19971217; EP 0556081 B2 20011219; CA 2089132 A1 19930812; CA 2089132 C 20020917; DE 69315717 D1 19980129; DE 69315717 T2 19980409; DE 69315717 T3 20030130; ES 2110069 T3 19980201; ES 2110069 T5 20020301; FR 2687055 A1 19930813; FR 2687055 B1 19940429; JP 3306672 B2 20020724; JP H0614812 A 19940125; US 5357647 A 19941025

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-07-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130717

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130126

2013-02-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130126

2013-01-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69315717

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: L'*OREAL

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-03-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-03-20 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2002-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20011226

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1998-09-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GEORG KARL GEKA-BRUSH GMBH

- Effective date: 19980710

1998-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19980113

1998-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2110069 T3

1998-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980131

1998-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19980131

1998-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69315717 19980129

1997-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-12-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1996-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960219

1993-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930128

1993-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI