Global Patent Index - EP 0556716 B1

EP 0556716 B1 2000-05-03 - Color developer for silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material

Title (en)

Color developer for silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material

Title (de)

Farbentwickler für ein farbphotographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial

Title (fr)

Révélateur couleur pour matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière

Publication

EP 0556716 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93102126 A

Priority

JP 6929692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0556716A2] Disclosed is a color developer for a silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material comprising at least one compound represented by Formula 1, and a color developing agent in an amount not less than 0.02 mol/l, and a compound selected from the group consisting of an aromatic sulfonic acid and an aromatic compound having a -O-SO3-R group in an amount not less than 2.5 mol per mol of a color developing agent: wherein R represents a hydrogen atom, a sodium atom, a potassium atom, an ammonium group or an lithium atom: <CHEM> wherein A and B each represent a linear or branched alkylene group, n and m each represent an integer of 0 to 100, provided that both A and B are not 0, and A or B is a linear or branched alkylene group having 3 or more carbon atoms when n + m =1. The color developer improves the maintenance efficiency of an automatic processor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/413

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/407 (2006.01); G03C 7/413 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/413 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0556716 A2 19930825; EP 0556716 A3 19950510; EP 0556716 B1 20000503; DE 69328510 D1 20000608; DE 69328510 T2 20000914; JP 3025368 B2 20000327; JP H05232653 A 19930910

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69328510

- Effective date: 20110901

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-10-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010211

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010211

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328510 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-05-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980317

1995-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951012

1995-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1993-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL