Global Patent Index - EP 0557047 B2

EP 0557047 B2 2001-01-03 - Sanitary napkins

Title (en)

Sanitary napkins

Title (de)

Hygienevorlagen

Title (fr)

Serviettes hygiéniques

Publication

EP 0557047 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 93301098 A

Priority

JP 6898192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0557047A1] A sanitary napkin (10) includes liquid barriers (15) and wings (16), wherein the liquid barriers (15) can be freely erected without any hindrance due to folding back of the wings (16). The sanitary napkin (10) comprises the above-mentioned liquid barriers (15) extending along laterally opposite sides thereof and provided with elastic members, respectively, and the above-mentioned wings (16) outwardly extending from the respective liquid barriers (15). The liquid barriers (15) and the wings (16) are branched from each other so that the liquid barriers (15) are not pulled outward even when the respective wings (16) are folded back onto the outer surface of a crotch zone of the user's shorts in order to fix the napkin thereto. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15; A61F 13/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/514 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/472 (2006.01); A61F 13/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/474 (2013.01); A61F 13/4752 (2013.01); A61F 13/4753 (2013.01); A61F 13/476 (2013.01); A61F 13/5616 (2013.01); A61F 13/49413 (2013.01); A61F 13/511 (2013.01); A61F 13/53 (2013.01); A61F 2013/4944 (2013.01); A61F 2013/4948 (2013.01); A61F 2013/51409 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0557047 A1 19930825; EP 0557047 B1 19970903; EP 0557047 B2 20010103; AU 3292693 A 19930819; AU 664410 B2 19951116; CA 2089210 A1 19930819; CA 2089210 C 19970923; CN 2153343 Y 19940119; DE 69313484 D1 19971009; DE 69313484 T2 19980226; DE 69313484 T3 20010809; GB 2264645 A 19930908; GB 2264645 B 19960424; GB 9303103 D0 19930331; JP 2986606 B2 19991206; JP H05220192 A 19930831; KR 0131808 Y1 19981215; PH 30099 A 19961227; US 5447507 A 19950905

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130219

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-02-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69313484

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-05-04 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-03-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LUNATI & MAZZONI S.A.S.

2001-01-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-05-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PAUL HARTMANN AG

- Effective date: 19980529

1998-07-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PAUL HARTMANN AG

- Effective date: 19980529

1997-11-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LUNATI & MAZZONI S.A.S.

1997-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69313484 19971009

1997-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1996-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960104

1993-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19931021

1993-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE