Global Patent Index - EP 0557940 B1

EP 0557940 B1 2000-09-27 - Speech coding system

Title (en)

Speech coding system

Title (de)

Sprachkodierungsystem

Title (fr)

Système de codage de la parole

Publication

EP 0557940 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93102794 A

Priority

JP 3588192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0557940A2] An input speech signal is splitted into a time section and the splitted signal is generated as a speech vector and LPC coefficient sets are developed by linear prediction analysis for every time section of the speech vector. The speech vector is weighted based on the developed LPC coefficient sets, then a plurality of the weighted speech vectors are connected and the connected speech vector having a predetermined frame length is generated. An excitation codevector whose weighted synthesized signal is the most similar to the weighted speech vector is determined among from a plurality of excitation vectors each having the frame length which are previously stored as a sound source. A plurality of adaptive codevectors each having the frame length and obtained by cutting out a sound source signal produced from the determined excitation vectors at predetermined timing points are stored in an adaptive codebook (145). An adaptive codevector whose weighted synthesized signal is the most similar to the weighted speech vector is determined among from the plurality of adaptive codevectors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/04 (2006.01); G10L 19/00 (2006.01); G10L 19/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0557940 A2 19930901; EP 0557940 A3 19940323; EP 0557940 B1 20000927; CA 2090205 A1 19930825; CA 2090205 C 19980804; DE 69329476 D1 20001102; DE 69329476 T2 20010208; JP 3248215 B2 20020121; JP H05232997 A 19930910

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080223

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080223

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-02-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 19/12 A

1997-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961219

1994-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940208

1994-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1993-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB