Global Patent Index - EP 0558390 B2

EP 0558390 B2 2001-01-17 - Profile lamella for a curtain and corresponding curtain

Title (en)

Profile lamella for a curtain and corresponding curtain

Title (de)

Profillamelle für einen Vorhang und entsprechender Vorhang

Title (fr)

Lame profilée pour fermeture à rideau, et rideau de fermeture correspondant

Publication

EP 0558390 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 93400436 A

Priority

FR 9202207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0558390A1] The cross-section of the profile lamella for a curtain has a large base (2) connected to a small base (3) via a first side (4) and a second side (5). The lamella (1) has a recess (6) and a snap ring (8) connected via a strip (7) of flexible material to the corner of the small base (3) and the second side (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/15 (2006.01); E06B 9/11 (2006.01); E06B 9/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/15 (2013.01); E06B 2009/1544 (2013.01); E06B 2009/1555 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0558390 A1 19930901; EP 0558390 B1 19960925; EP 0558390 B2 20010117; AT 143454 T 19961015; DE 69304954 D1 19961031; DE 69304954 T2 19970507; DE 69304954 T3 20010823; ES 2094493 T3 19970116; ES 2094493 T5 20010316; FR 2687724 A1 19930827; FR 2687724 B1 19940805

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-02-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69304954

2013-02-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69304954

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGEAIS JOSEPH

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080220

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080219

2009-05-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080220

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-03-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-02-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2002-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-02-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-05-16 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-03-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2001-02-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-01-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-02-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000209

- Year of fee payment: 8

1999-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

1999-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: REHAU AG & CO.

1998-12-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: REHAU AG & CO.

- Effective date: 19970614

1997-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: REHAU AG & CO.

1997-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: REHAU AG & CO.

- Effective date: 19970614

1997-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2094493 T3

1996-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19961225

1996-12-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1996-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19961101

1996-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

1996-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69304954 19961031

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-09-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 19960925

1996-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960925

1996-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 143454 T 19961015

1996-08-30 [REG CH PLI] LICENCE

- Owner name: LEGEAIS, JOSEPH TRANSFER- PLASTIL, S.A.

1994-12-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19941109

1994-11-30 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 0100 PLASTIL, S.A.

1994-09-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1993-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930924

1993-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE