Global Patent Index - EP 0558835 B1

EP 0558835 B1 2001-05-09 - Biodegradable lubricants and functional fluids

Title (en)

Biodegradable lubricants and functional fluids

Title (de)

Biologisch abbaubare Schmieröle und funktionelle Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Lubrifiants et fluides fonctionnels biodégradables

Publication

EP 0558835 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92300777 A

Priority

EP 92300777 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0558835A1] Certain unhydrogenated oligomers of 1-alkene hydrocarbons have been found to be substantially biodegradable upon exposure to microbiological agents of types widely available in the environment. Thus, in an operation wherein lubricating oil or functional fluid is released into the environment, there is provided for use as the lubricating oil or functional fluid a substantially biodegradable lubricating oil or functional fluid at least 10 percent by volume of which is composed of at least one substantially biodegradable unhydrogenated liquid hydrocarbon of lubricating viscosity formed by oligomerization of 1-alkene hydrocarbon having 6 to 20 carbon atoms in the molecule.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 107/10; C10M 111/04; C10M 169/04; C10M 171/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 107/10 (2006.01); C10M 111/04 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 171/007 (2013.01); C10M 101/02 (2013.01); C10M 101/04 (2013.01); C10M 105/32 (2013.01); C10M 105/36 (2013.01); C10M 105/38 (2013.01); C10M 107/10 (2013.01); C10M 107/34 (2013.01); C10M 111/04 (2013.01); C10M 129/10 (2013.01); C10M 133/12 (2013.01); C10M 133/28 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 169/048 (2013.01); C10M 2203/06 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/02 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/028 (2013.01); C10M 2205/0285 (2013.01); C10M 2205/06 (2013.01); C10M 2205/20 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/16 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2805 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2825 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/284 (2013.01); C10M 2207/285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2855 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10M 2207/345 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/401 (2013.01); C10M 2207/402 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2207/4045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/103 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1055 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1095 (2013.01); C10M 2211/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/102 (2013.01); C10M 2215/18 (2013.01); C10M 2215/182 (2013.01); C10M 2215/222 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/023 (2013.01); C10M 2217/024 (2013.01); C10M 2217/028 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/02 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/088 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/065 (2013.01); C10M 2223/12 (2013.01); C10M 2225/04 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/105 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0558835 A1 19930908; EP 0558835 B1 20010509; DE 69231820 D1 20010613; DE 69231820 T2 20010823; ES 2158843 T3 20010916

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050130

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BP AMOCO CORP.

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158843 T3

2001-06-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. DR. CAVATTONI ING. A. RAIMONDI

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231820 20010613

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BP AMOCO CORPORATION

1996-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961030

1996-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMOCO CORPORATION

1995-02-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALBEMARLE CORPORATION

1994-05-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940303

1993-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT