Global Patent Index - EP 0559538 B1

EP 0559538 B1 2000-05-17 - Quaternary salts of 4-substituted piperidines, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them

Title (en)

Quaternary salts of 4-substituted piperidines, their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them

Title (de)

Quartäre Salze 4-substituierter Piperidine, ihre Herstellung sowie diese enthaltende Arzneimittel

Title (fr)

Sels quaternaires de pipéridines 4-substitués, leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant

Publication

EP 0559538 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 93400513 A

Priority

  • FR 9202542 A
  • FR 9212941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0559538A1] The subject of the present invention is quaternary ammonium salts of formula: <IMAGE> in which: - J represents either an Ar-CXX'-CX" group or an Ar-(CH2)x CX1 group in which: . Ar represents an optionally substituted phenyl; a cycloalkyl; a pyridyl or a thienyl; . X represents hydrogen; . X' represents hydrogen or is combined with X" below to form a carbon-carbon bond or else X and X' together form an oxo group; . x is zero or one; . X1 represents hydrogen (x=0), a hydroxyl, an alkoxy, an acyloxy, a carboxyl, a carbalkoxy, a cyano, a carbamoylalkyl, a mercapto or an alkylthio; - Q represents an alkyl group or a benzyl group; - A represents an anion; - m is 2 or 3; - Ar' represents an optionally substituted phenyl, a thienyl, a benzothienyl, a naphthyl or an optionally N-substituted indolyl; - R represents hydrogen or a C1-C6 alkyl; - T represents -CO- or -CW-NH-, W being an oxygen or sulphur atom, and - Z represents either hydrogen, or M or OM when T represents the -CO- group or M when T represents the -CW-NH- group; M represents especially an alkyl, an alpha -hydroxybenzyl, a alpha -hydroxyalkylbenzyl, a phenylalkyl, a pyridylalkyl, a naphthylalkyl, a pyridylthioalkyl or a styryl. APPLICATION: medicaments, in particular for the treatment of pathological phenomena which involve the neurokinin system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 211/14; A61K 31/445; C07D 211/48; C07D 211/52; C07D 211/58; C07D 401/06; C07D 409/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/451 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); C07D 211/14 (2006.01); C07D 211/44 (2006.01); C07D 211/48 (2006.01); C07D 211/52 (2006.01); C07D 211/54 (2006.01); C07D 211/58 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 409/06 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 211/14 (2013.01); C07D 211/44 (2013.01); C07D 211/48 (2013.01); C07D 211/52 (2013.01); C07D 211/58 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0559538 A1 19930908; EP 0559538 B1 20000517; AT 193015 T 20000615; CA 2090785 A1 19930904; DE 69328643 D1 20000621; DE 69328643 T2 20001228; FR 2688219 A1 19930910; FR 2688219 B1 19940708; HU 217838 B 20000428; HU 9300580 D0 19930528; HU T70167 A 19950928; JP H06507425 A 19940825; MX 9301158 A 19930901; US 5674881 A 19971007; US 5773620 A 19980630; WO 9318002 A1 19930916

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090302

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-11-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS

- Free text: SANOFI-SYNTHELABO#174, AVENUE DE FRANCE#75013 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SANOFI-AVENTIS#174, AVENUE DE FRANCE#75013 PARIS (FR)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SANOFI-SYNTHELABO

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-03-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-08-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328643 20000621

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193015 T 20000615

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANOFI-SYNTHELABO

1998-12-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANOFI

1997-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970218

1994-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANOFI

1993-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930701

1993-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE