Global patent index - EP 0559846 B2

EP 0559846 B2 2001-03-21 - DEVICE FOR TURNING A SHEET WITH A SIMULTANEOUS CHANGE IN THE DIRECTION OF TRANSPORT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR TURNING A SHEET WITH A SIMULTANEOUS CHANGE IN THE DIRECTION OF TRANSPORT

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM WENDEN EINES BLATTES UNTER GLEICHZEITIGER ÄNDERUNG DER FÖRDERRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE RETOURNEMENT D'UNE FEUILLE AVEC CHANGEMENT SIMULTANE DU SENS DE TRANSPORT

Publication

EP 0559846 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92908174 A

Priority

  • DE 4122214 A
  • EP 9200829 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4122214A1] Sheet or sets of sheets are turned very rapidly and reliably, especially after the cutting of endless stationery, conveyed further in a different transport direction and separated in that the leading edge of the sheet is taken to a diagonal bending slot via which a corner of a sheet first reaches an outlet slot in which the leading edge of the sheet is taken in a direction perpendicular to the feed direction in a plane lying parallel to the transport plane but at a certain distance therefrom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/26 (2006.01); B65H 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/025 (2013.01); B65H 5/26 (2013.01); B65H 15/00 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3423 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4454 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4122214 A1 19930114; EP 0559846 A1 19930915; EP 0559846 B1 19960717; EP 0559846 B2 20010321; US 5362039 A 19941108; US RE38867 E 20051108; WO 9301115 A1 19930121

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20051230

2006-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050413

2005-04-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050413

2004-09-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-07-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-05-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-04-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.TIERGARTENSTRASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-04-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *PITNEY BOWES DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20040426

2002-01-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2001-07-04 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2001-06-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-04 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2001-05-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2001-03-21 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1997-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PITNEY BOWES INC.

1997-06-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PITNEY BOWES INC.

- Effective date: 19970417

1996-10-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1996-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19960821

1996-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1996-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59206783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-08-22

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

1995-02-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19941227

1993-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19931006

1993-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL