Global Patent Index - EP 0561128 B1

EP 0561128 B1 2000-04-12 - Winding method and apparatus

Title (en)

Winding method and apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Wickeln und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif destiné à l'enroulement d'un matériau

Publication

EP 0561128 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93101351 A

Priority

CH 87092 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0561128A1] Method and apparatus for winding material webs onto winding cores. A material web is fed via a winding drum (6) to the winding core (10) or package (8). The winding drum (6) is displaceable, and the package (8) is blocked against displacement during the winding operation. An adjusting device (60) keeps the winding drum (6) under constant pressure against or at a constant distance from the package. With the growing package (8), the winding drum (6) is displaced counter to the force of the adjusting device (60) into one limit position. When this is reached, the blocking of the package is released and the adjusting device (60) pushes the winding drum (6) into another limit position, whereupon the package (8) is blocked again. This sequence of movement is repeated until the package (8) is completed. …<IMAGE>…

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41358 (2013.01); B65H 2404/43 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0561128 A1 19930922; EP 0561128 B1 20000412; AT 191700 T 20000415; DE 59310002 D1 20000518; JP H07257785 A 19951009; JP H085571 B2 19960124; US 5308008 A 19940503

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59310002

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110202

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KIEFEL EXTRUSION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100131

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-04-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080129

2008-06-25 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2008-04-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *KIEFEL EXTRUSION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080409

2008-04-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-03-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KIEFEL EXTRUSIONS GMBH

- Free text: WINTECH WINDING TECHNOLOGY AG#FELDMOOSSTRASSE 12#8853 LACHEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KIEFEL EXTRUSIONS GMBH#CORNELIUS-HEYL-STRASSE 49#57547 WORMS (DE)

2007-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-09-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-06-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-05-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RUEEGG, ANTON TRANSFER- WINTECH WINDING TECHNOLOGY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000516

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310002 20000518

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191700 T 20000415

1996-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960807

1994-04-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940226

1993-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE