Global Patent Index - EP 0561596 B2

EP 0561596 B2 2001-12-19 - Oriented polyester film

Title (en)

Oriented polyester film

Title (de)

Orientierte Polyesterfolie

Title (fr)

Film orienté de polyester

Publication

EP 0561596 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 93301954 A

Priority

  • JP 6344492 A
  • JP 6344592 A
  • JP 7109392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0561596A2] An oriented polyester film (A) which comprises modified polyethylene-2,6-naphthalenedicarboxylate containing a 4,4'-diphenyldicarboxylic acid component and having a heat of crystallization of 16 to 25.5 Joule/g, and (B) which is biaxially oriented; and an oriented polyester film (A') which comprises modified polyethylene-2,6-naphthalenedicarboxylate containing of a glycol component derived from a compound represented by the following formula, <CHEM> wherein each of n and m is independently a positive number of 1 to 9 as an average, provided that m + n equals 2 to 9 as an average. and having a heat of crystallization of 6 to 20 Joule/g, and (B) which is biaxially oriented. These films are useful as a base film for a magnetic recording tape or as an electric insulation film.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 5/18; C08L 67/02; H01B 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 63/185 (2006.01); C08G 63/672 (2006.01); C08J 5/18 (2006.01); H01B 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/18 (2013.01); C08G 63/185 (2013.01); C08G 63/672 (2013.01); H01B 3/422 (2013.01); C08J 2367/02 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31786 (2015.04)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0561596 A2 19930922; EP 0561596 A3 19940831; EP 0561596 B1 19980708; EP 0561596 B2 20011219; DE 69319472 D1 19980813; DE 69319472 T2 19990304; DE 69319472 T3 20030220; DE 69332122 D1 20020822; DE 69332122 T2 20030213; EP 0787760 A2 19970806; EP 0787760 A3 19980401; EP 0787760 B1 20020717; US 5312893 A 19940517; US 5352534 A 19941004

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110315

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69319472

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110315

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2002-05-17 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 97201058.1 EINGEREICHT AM 09/04/97.

1999-06-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MITSUBISHI POLYESTER FILM GMBH

- Effective date: 19990407

1998-09-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-08-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69319472 19980813

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEIJIN LIMITED

1998-07-08 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: TEILANMELDUNG 97201058.1 EINGEREICHT AM 09/04/97.

1996-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960305

1995-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950113

1994-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1993-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB