Global Patent Index - EP 0562266 B1

EP 0562266 B1 2000-07-12 - Winder for winding a web, in particular a paper web

Title (en)

Winder for winding a web, in particular a paper web

Title (de)

Wickelmaschine zum Aufwickeln einer Bahn, insbesondere einer Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Machine d'enroulement pour enrouler une bande, en particulier une bande de papier

Publication

EP 0562266 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93102505 A

Priority

DE 4209754 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5335871A] A winder for winding a running paper web is provided that includes a first and a second support roller that together form a winding bed to hold a paper roll with the paper web wound around the first support roller. The winding bed consists of the first and the second support rollers. The first and the second support rollers are fixed into position with the second support roller being positioned lower than the first support roller so that a plane through the axes of the first and the second support rollers forms an angle with a horizontal plane. The first and the second support rollers each having a liner. The liner of the second support roller is considerably more deformable than the liner of the first support roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/20; B65H 18/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01); B65H 18/20 (2006.01); B65H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 27/00 (2013.01); B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2401/10 (2013.01); B65H 2404/114 (2013.01); B65H 2404/136 (2013.01); B65H 2404/142 (2013.01); B65H 2404/18 (2013.01); B65H 2404/185 (2013.01); B65H 2404/4214 (2013.01); B65H 2404/43 (2013.01); B65H 2515/12 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3639244 A1 19870521 - WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5335871 A 19940809; AT 194583 T 20000715; CA 2092462 A1 19930927; CA 2092462 C 20001024; EP 0562266 A1 19930929; EP 0562266 B1 20000712; EP 0957052 A2 19991117; EP 0957052 A3 19991124; FI 110257 B 20021231; FI 931096 A0 19930311; FI 931096 A 19930927; JP 2908171 B2 19990621; JP H06115771 A 19940426

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070219

2006-02-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-02-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050218

2004-02-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-02-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-02-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310072 20000817

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194583 T 20000715

1994-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19940603

1994-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940117

1993-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE