Global Patent Index - EP 0562349 B2

EP 0562349 B2 2000-08-30 - Method and apparatus for drawing faulty packages out of a packaging machine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for drawing faulty packages out of a packaging machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aussondern fehlerhafter Packungen im Bereich einer Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour sortir des emballages défectueux d'une machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 0562349 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93103739 A

Priority

DE 4209454 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0562349A2] 2.1. In the production of bundles composed of a plurality of individual packs, especially of a group (11) of cigarette packs (10), a check as to the complete number of cigarette packs (10) of a group (11) is necessary. Packs (13) thus found to be defective are marked in an externally visible manner and are separated out later, especially in the region of a discharge-conveyor track (26). 2.2. The marking of the defective packs (13) takes place by the folding round of a folding tab of an outer wrapping (12), especially of a lower tab (33) in the region of a side wall located at the rear in the conveying direction. The lower tab (33) forms a gusset (36) folded round outwards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 57/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/28 (2006.01); B65B 19/32 (2006.01); B65B 61/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/32 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0562349 A2 19930929; EP 0562349 A3 19940323; EP 0562349 B1 19960828; EP 0562349 B2 20000830; DE 4209454 A1 19930930; JP 2565638 B2 19961218; JP H0640421 A 19940215; US 5412926 A 19950509

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100316

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-05 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-11-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-20 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-08-30 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-06-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: G.D S.P.A.

- Effective date: 19970414

1996-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-10-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN

1996-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59303530 19961002

1996-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960828

1996-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950601

1994-08-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940601

1994-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1994-03-23 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 57/10

1993-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT