Global Patent Index - EP 0562893 B2

EP 0562893 B2 2000-12-20 - Process for the production of high pressure nitrogen and oxygen

Title (en)

Process for the production of high pressure nitrogen and oxygen

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hochdruck-Stickstoff und Sauerstoff

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'azote sous haute pression et d'oxygène

Publication

EP 0562893 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 93400522 A

Priority

FR 9203501 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0562893A1] According to this process, after the nitrogen originating from the low pressure column (11) is heated, it is compressed to the high pressure by means of a single nitrogen compressor (7) and the low-pressure column (11) is operated at a pressure of the order of PN/ rho N, where PN denotes the high pressure of nitrogen and rho N the compression ratio of the said nitrogen compressor. Application to the simultaneous production of, on the one hand, nitrogen of high purity at a pressure of between 50 and 60 bars and, on the other hand, oxygen at 65 bars, to feed a unit for producing ammonia. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04145 (2013.01); F25J 3/04018 (2013.01); F25J 3/0403 (2013.01); F25J 3/0409 (2013.01); F25J 3/04121 (2013.01); F25J 3/04315 (2013.01); F25J 3/04351 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04539 (2013.01); F25J 3/04545 (2013.01); F25J 3/04587 (2013.01); F25J 2200/20 (2013.01); F25J 2230/50 (2013.01); F25J 2290/12 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • EP 0384483 A2 19900829 - LINDE AG [DE]
  • SU 739316 A1 19800605 - BELYAKOV VIKTOR P [SU], et al
  • Prospectus de l'entreprise Atlas Copco: "Process-Engineered Centrifugal Compressors", 1991, pages 1 à 24
  • Rohde, W., "Plants with Molecular Sieve Absorbers, Comparison with other Processes and Operational Advantages", LINDE-Symposium "Air Separation Plats", juin 1986, pages 1 à 20
  • Springmann, H., "Die Gewinnung von Hochdruck-Sauerstoff", LINDE-Berichte aus Wissenschaft und Technik, 46/1979

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0562893 A1 19930929; EP 0562893 B1 19970507; EP 0562893 B2 20001220; CA 2092140 A1 19930925; CA 2092140 C 19980818; DE 69310429 D1 19970612; DE 69310429 T2 19971211; DE 69310429 T3 20010823; ES 2101256 T3 19970701; ES 2101256 T5 20010316; FR 2689224 A1 19931001; FR 2689224 B1 19940506; US 5341647 A 19940830; ZA 9302796 B 19930930

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070302

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070303

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070303

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-03-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060302

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-03-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-03-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2001-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-12-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT NL

1998-06-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1998-04-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19980206

1997-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2101256 T3

1997-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69310429 19970612

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT NL

1995-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950714

1993-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930305

1993-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT NL