Global Patent Index - EP 0563550 B2

EP 0563550 B2 2001-01-10 - Fitting for a door or window pivotable around its central axis

Title (en)

Fitting for a door or window pivotable around its central axis

Title (de)

Beschlag für einen um eine etwa mittlere Achse drehbaren Flügel

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour fenêtre ou porte pivotante autour son axe central

Publication

EP 0563550 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93102120 A

Priority

DE 9202933 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0563550A2] In up-and-over wings, but also in revolving wings, which are usually large wings, the upper and the lower wing half must, in the closing position, be drawn or pressed firmly up against the fixed frame (1), in order to guarantee the necessary sealing and to prevent a warping of the wing frame (2). Such fastenings (30) can be attached and actuated in a simple way by means of standard or at least virtually standard elements, if, according to the invention, the fitting is formed in the region of the pivot bearings (6) and (7). For this purpose, there is mounted displaceably in the wing-bearing part (8) of at least one of the pivot bearings (6, 7) a coupling part (33), to which are coupled, on the one hand, a first push rod (27) displaceable directly on the basic profile (18) of the wing frame (2) and a second push rod (32) offset outwards relative thereto and mounted displaceably on a rebate strip (20) of the wing frame (2). The rebate jump or the jump in the sealing plane is thereby bridged in a simple way. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/20; E05C 9/00; E05D 3/02; E06B 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2006.01); E05D 7/083 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9202933 U1 19920430; AT 137298 T 19960515; EP 0563550 A2 19931006; EP 0563550 A3 19940914; EP 0563550 B1 19960424; EP 0563550 B2 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-02-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-02-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030205

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-01-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-05-11 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-01-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-01-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1997-03-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: W. HAUTAU GMBH

- Effective date: 19970124

1996-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59302315 19960530

1996-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1996-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 137298 T 19960515

1995-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950704

1994-11-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940928

1994-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1993-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI