Global Patent Index - EP 0565502 B2

EP 0565502 B2 2000-07-26 - Pipe handling equipment and method for a rock drilling machine

Title (en)

Pipe handling equipment and method for a rock drilling machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Handhaben von Rohren für eine Gesteinbohrmaschine

Title (fr)

Installation et procédé de manipulation de tiges pour une machine de forage de roche

Publication

EP 0565502 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 93850062 A

Priority

SE 9201119 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0565502A1] Handling equipment for handling drill tubes at a rock drilling machine, comprising a feed beam (3) adjustable to different slopes, a drifter (20) which is moveable along the feed beam, and an adapter (21) which connects the drifter to the upper end of drill tubes for transmitting percussive and/or rotation power to such drill tubes. The handling equipment comprises a magazine (16) for the drill tubes positioned the feed beam so that the drill tubes in the magazines are essentially parallel with the feed, a grip member (10) for gripping the drill tubes and operation means (4 - 9) for moving a gripped drill tube to a drilling position at the feed beam for screwing on the adapter and possibly on drill tubes already in the hole. The magazine further comprises a spacing means (18) for cooperation with one end of an inner drill tube positioned inside each outer drill tube in the magazine for spacing said one end of the inner drill tube from the corresponding end of the outer drill tube, and a gripping means for gripping the inner drill tube at the portion extending from the outer drill tube during the movement from the magazine to the drilling position at the feed beam. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2006.01); E21B 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2013.01); E21B 19/20 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

EP 0379187 A1 19900725 - BAUER SPEZIALTIEFBAU [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK

EPO simple patent family

EP 0565502 A1 19931013; EP 0565502 B1 19961030; EP 0565502 B2 20000726; DE 565502 T1 19950928; DE 69305678 D1 19961205; DE 69305678 T2 19970320; DE 69305678 T3 20001116; DK 0565502 T3 19970217; DK 0565502 T4 20000918; SE 500747 C2 19940822; SE 9201119 D0 19920407; SE 9201119 L 19931008

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-04-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69305678

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-02 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-18 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T4

2000-07-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK

1997-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ING. G. KLEMM BOHRTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 19970724

1997-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEILMANN-HANIEL GMBH

- Effective date: 19970724

1997-02-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

1996-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69305678

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1996-12-05

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK

1995-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950817

1995-09-28 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

1994-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940412

1993-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK