Global Patent Index - EP 0565967 B2

EP 0565967 B2 2000-10-18 - Pot-shaped container, in particular a bucket, with lid

Title (en)

Pot-shaped container, in particular a bucket, with lid

Title (de)

Topfförmiges Gefäss, insbesondere Eimer, mit Deckel

Title (fr)

Récipient en forme de pot, notamment un seau, avec couvercle

Publication

EP 0565967 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93105464 A

Priority

DE 9205256 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0565967A1] Pot-shaped containers, in particular buckets 1 or the like having a lid 6 whose edge 5 can be connected to an attachment flange 4 or the like which is moulded onto the container edge 3 and projects outwards are already known, in which in the catch position of the lid 6 an inwardly projecting strip 13 moulded onto the circumferential edge 12 of said lid engages behind the outer edge of the attachment flange 4. In order to guarantee both an intensive closure between the bucket edge 3 and the lid 6 and at the same time to allow easy raising of the lid from the bucket edge, the strip 13 engages snugly and in a sealing manner around the outer edge 18 of the attachment flange 4 and at least one tool 14 is arranged on the container edge 3 for detaching the lid 6. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 43/10 (2006.01); B65D 43/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 43/267 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0015 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00509 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00555 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00629 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0074 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00944 (2013.01); B65D 2543/0099 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9205256 U1 19920617; AT 125510 T 19950815; EP 0565967 A1 19931020; EP 0565967 B1 19950726; EP 0565967 B2 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59300395

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAIER VERPACKINGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAIER VERPACKINGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050402

2005-04-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050402

2004-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-07-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2001-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SAIER VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2001-03-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. FELIX H. THOMANN ADVOKAT

2001-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: SAIER GMBH & CO. TRANSFER- SAIER VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-01-19 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

2000-11-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-10-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU NL

1996-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DIJKSTRA PLASTICS B.V.

1996-06-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DIJKSTRA PLASTICS B.V.

- Effective date: 19960425

1995-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1995-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59300395

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-08-31

1995-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU NL

1995-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 125510

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1995-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1995-02-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19941229

1993-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19930830

1993-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU NL