Global patent index - EP 0566539 B1

EP 0566539 B1 2000-06-21 - Reinforcement for masonry

Title (en)

Reinforcement for masonry

Title (de)

Bewehrung für ein Mauerwerk

Title (fr)

Armature pour maçonnerie

Publication

EP 0566539 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93810258 A

Priority

CH 121992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0566539A1] The invention relates to a reinforcement for a masonry structure comprising a plurality of masonry blocks (2;2a,..., 2d) which have been laid one upon the other and between which there are provided joints (3) filled with mortar, which reinforcement comprises at least one reinforcing element (1) which is arranged at least partially in one of the joints (3) and is embedded in the mortar. In order to simplify the introduction, and to improve the stability, of said reinforcement, the invention provides at least one elastically pliable longitudinal element (4) in the form of a filament and/or thin bar which consists of a concrete-compatible, tension-resistant and non-metallic material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4178 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0566539 A1 19931020; EP 0566539 B1 20000621; AT 194022 T 20000715; DE 59310061 D1 20000727

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-04-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. JOACHIM LAUER PATENTANWALT

2001-05-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SYSTEM ALBANESE

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-05-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BAUMGARTNER B. AKKORD AG

- Effective date: 20010319

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-11-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310061

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-27

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HUG INTERLIZENZ AG

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2000-06-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194022

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1995-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950703

1994-06-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940412

1993-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL