Global Patent Index - EP 0568934 B2

EP 0568934 B2 2000-10-11 - Device for lifting prefabricated components, particularly made of concrete or the like

Title (en)

Device for lifting prefabricated components, particularly made of concrete or the like

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Heben von vorgefertigten Gegenständen, insbesondere aus Beton oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour lever des objets préfabriqués, en particulier faits de béton ou analogue

Publication

EP 0568934 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 93107047 A

Priority

IT MI921086 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0568934A2] The device has a plate (2), arranged in a plane substantially parallel to the lifting direction, to be embedded in the component (3), except for an end (4) which can be accommodated in a recess (5) formed in the component (3) and can be accessed from outside. The device also has a handle (6), a portion of which is insertable in the recess (5) and provided with a notch (10) in which the end (4) of the plate (2) can be accommodated. A seat (11) is formed in the body of the handle (6), extends substantially at right angles with respect to the notch (10) and accommodates a latch (12) slideable along the axis of the seat (11) to engage or disengage a hole (13) which is formed in the end (4) of the plate (2) and can be arranged in the notch (10) of the handle (6) in alignment with the seat (11). The end (4) of the plate (2) is furthermore shaped so as to couple to the bottom (14) of the correspondingly shaped notch (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/66; E04G 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2006.01); E04G 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/666 (2013.01); E04G 21/142 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • DE 2704435 A1 19780810 - FRICKER FRIMEDA METALL DRAHT
  • DE 3733703 A1 19890427 - FRICKER SIEGFRIED [DE]
  • "Frimeda Ringtransportankersystem" Vol. 3/77, 8/77 in combination with sworn statement by Mrs Doris Falz as the availability to the public of vol. 3/77
  • "Verankerungen zum transport von Betonfertigteilen" in the publication : Beton+Fertigteile-Technik vol. 12/1976, p. 633-634

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0568934 A2 19931110; EP 0568934 A3 19940504; EP 0568934 B1 19970924; EP 0568934 B2 20001011; AT 158562 T 19971015; DE 69314084 D1 19971030; DE 69314084 T2 19980219; DE 69314084 T3 20010523; ES 2109389 T3 19980116; ES 2109389 T5 20010216; GR 3025584 T3 19980331; GR 3035030 T3 20010330; IT 1255140 B 19951020; IT MI921086 A1 19931107; IT MI921086 D0 19920506

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2013-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130716

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69314084

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20000402717

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZAMBELLI, BENITO

- Free text: ZAMBELLI, BENITO#VIA ROMA 44#I-24050 ZANICA (BERGAMO) (IT) $ ZAMBELLI, SERGIO#VIA ROMA 44#I-24050 ZANICA (BERGAMO) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- ZAMBELLI, BENITO#VIA ROMA 44#I-24050 ZANICA (BERGAMO) (IT) $ ZAMBELLI, SERGIO#VIA ROMA 44#I-24050 ZANICA (BERGAMO) (IT)

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110416

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110413

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-11-10 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-10-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-10-11 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1998-08-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HALFEN GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19980622

1998-03-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1998-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2109389 T3

1997-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 19971226

1997-12-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19971224

1997-12-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

1997-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69314084 19971030

1997-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1997-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

1997-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1997-09-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-09-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-09-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-09-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-09-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 158562 T 19971015

1996-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961112

1994-12-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941031

1994-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

1993-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE