Global patent index - EP 0569788 B1

EP 0569788 B1 2000-01-26 - (Un)loader

Title (en)

(Un)loader

Title (de)

Be- und Entladeanordnung

Title (fr)

Machine (dé)chargeuse

Publication

EP 0569788 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93106959 A

Priority

  • CH 119093 A
  • CH 168292 A
  • US 6017093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0569788A1] The object of the invention is to provide a loading and unloading arrangement by means of which the time-saving loading and unloading of a conveyor of a handling appliance is possible, whether in an autoclave or in a store or in another handling appliance, such as an appliance for infusing or boiling or freezing. A primary conveying device (PF) is provided for transferring the article (S) to and from a loading and unloading apparatus (1.1, 2.1) for the conveyor (F). By this means, the article (S) is transported to or away from a feed conveyor (1.9, 2.8). The article (S) is guided away from the feed conveyor (1.9, 2.8) to the conveyor (F) or away from the latter by means of transfer apparatuses (U1, U2) upstream of the conveyor (F). With such an arrangement, the article (S) can change over in rapid sequence between freshly introduced product and treated product, because the inward and outward transport can occur on one side and the loading and unloading on the other side, at a distance from each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 47/57; B65G 47/82; B65G 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/57 (2006.01); B65G 47/82 (2006.01); B65G 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 65/00 (2013.01); B65G 47/57 (2013.01); B65G 47/82 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0569788 A1 19931118; EP 0569788 B1 20000126; US 5409097 A 19950425

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2003-02-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020429

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020429

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010616

- Year of fee payment: 09

2001-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010430

- Year of fee payment: 09

2001-04-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010404

- Year of fee payment: 09

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-04-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000429

2000-04-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59309937

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189176

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1995-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951017

1994-09-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940725

1993-11-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT SE