Global patent index - EP 0570613 B1

EP 0570613 B1 2000-04-19 - Device for bidirectional communication on a telephone line

Title (en)

Device for bidirectional communication on a telephone line

Title (de)

Gerät für Zweirichtungskommunikation auf einer Fernsprechleitung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour communication bidirectionelle employant le réseau téléphonique

Publication

EP 0570613 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92108700 A

Priority

  • EP 92108700 A
  • US 86005892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0570613A1] The invention relates to an idle time communication device in which communication windows are created during the transmission of broadcast data from a center unit (10; 17, 17', 17'') to a user's home device (38), said windows being designed to augment the data transmission function by enabling one-to-one bidirectional communication between said center (10) and said user's home (30). The present invention assumes the prior existence of a communication device for the transmission of broadcast data from said independent center (10) through the telephone network (40) to said user's home (30) and achieves its object of one-to-one bidirectional communication between said center (10) and said user's home (30) through the use of packet communication which is carried out during the idle time on said telephone network (40), which connects the switching system (21) of the local telephone exchange (20) with the telephone in said user's home (30). This makes one-to-one bidirectional communication possible and, in so doing, also enables both the transmission of download data from a control unit (11) to a specified terminal (32) and also the transmission of upload data from a specified terminal (32) to a control unit (11) without confusion between terminals in either case. This enables, for example, (a) a control device (11) to transmit download data to a specified terminal (32) and for the due arrival of said download data to be confirmed at the center (10) by the return upload of data from said terminal (32), (b) the center (10) to receive music requests and instructions in the form of upload data from a terminal (32), and (c) the creation of a protocol that will enable error-free communication to be carried out between control device (11) and terminal (32). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 11/06; H04M 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 11/06 (2006.01); H04M 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 11/06 (2013.01); H04M 11/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0570613 A1 19931124; EP 0570613 B1 20000419; US 5357505 A 19941018

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120521

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20120523

2012-06-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20120521

2012-05-30 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20120522

2012-05-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69230933

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69230933

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-25

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1996-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960809

1994-07-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940524

1993-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL