Global Patent Index - EP 0571353 B2

EP 0571353 B2 2000-01-26 - Process of galvanizing a strip and arrangement for carrying out the process

Title (en)

Process of galvanizing a strip and arrangement for carrying out the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verzinken eines Bandes sowie Anlage zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour galvaniser un feuillard et installation pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0571353 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 93890053 A

Priority

AT 65492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0571353A2] In a process for galvanising a strip (1) the strip (1) is continuously coated with zinc, is then, so as to form a Zn-Fe layer, subjected to a heat treatment in a continuous furnace (10, 11), followed by on-line monitoring of the zinc layer, the iron content of the zinc layer being measured and the galvanising operation being controlled as a function of the iron content of the zinc layer. In order to be able to manufacture a strip (1) having a defined layer structure ensuring uniform quality, a value of the iron content of the Zn-Fe layer is determined as a reference input variable, the actual value of the iron content of the Zn-Fe layer is compared with the reference input variable and any system deviation is compensated via a controller (19) by means of a change in the continuous furnace (10, 11) heating output which serves as the manipulated variable (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/06 (2006.01); C23C 2/28 (2006.01); C25D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0571353 A2 19931124; EP 0571353 A3 19940126; EP 0571353 B1 19960131; EP 0571353 B2 20000126; AT 133717 T 19960215; AT 397815 B 19940725; AT A65492 A 19931115; DE 59301528 D1 19960314; JP H06207297 A 19940726

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110323

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOEST-ALPINE STAHL LINZ G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-09-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2000-06-05 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-06-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-05-10 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

2000-04-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-01-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000126

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

1997-03-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SOCIETE SOLLAC

1996-12-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SOCIETE SOLLAC

- Effective date: 19961025

1996-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SOCIETE SOLLAC

- Effective date: 19961022

1996-06-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960523

1996-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19960430

1996-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & MITTLER S.R.L.

1996-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19960331

1996-03-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 19960323

1996-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59301528 19960314

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

1996-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19960131

1996-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 133717 T 19960215

1995-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950216

1994-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940211

1994-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

1993-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE