Global Patent Index - EP 0573281 B1

EP 0573281 B1 2000-09-27 - Method for optimizing a light source profile in an optical exposure apparatus and optical exposure method in which a light source profile is set using such optimization method, in particular where the light is projected obliquely towards a mask

Title (en)

Method for optimizing a light source profile in an optical exposure apparatus and optical exposure method in which a light source profile is set using such optimization method, in particular where the light is projected obliquely towards a mask

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Optimierung eines Lichtquellen-Profils in einem optischen Belichtungsapparat und Verfahren zur optischen Belichtung, in welchem ein Lichtquellen-Profil aus diesem Optimierungsverfahrens verwendet wird, insbesondere indem das Licht schräg auf eine Maske projiziert wird

Title (fr)

Procédé d'optimisation du profil d'une source lumineuse dans un appareil de projection optique et procédé de projection optique basé sur un profil d'une source lumineuse obtenu par ce procédé d'optimisation, notamment par projection oblique de la lumière vers un masque

Publication

EP 0573281 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93304280 A

Priority

  • JP 14154892 A
  • JP 14175592 A
  • JP 18291392 A
  • JP 26741592 A
  • JP 6059393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0573281A2] An optical exposure method in photolithography applied for precise processing when semiconductor devices are produced. A pattern on a photomask (307) is projected and exposed on a wafer (309) with an exposure device including an oblique illumination system, a photomask and a projection lens (308). The oblique illumination system is composed of a light source (301), an aperture plate (305) and a condenser lens (303). In one embodiment, the aperture plate has at least opening which is elongated in the direction of elongation of elements of the mask pattern. Alternatively, an array of openings can be orientated according to the direction of elongation of elements of the mask pattern. The illumination can be linearly polarised in the direction of elongation of elements of the mask pattern. The disclosure includes a method for selecting the optimum fly's eye condenser profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/20 (2006.01); G03F 7/207 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/70566 (2013.01); G03F 7/201 (2013.01); G03F 7/70091 (2013.01); G03F 7/701 (2013.01); G03F 7/70125 (2013.01); G03F 7/70241 (2013.01); G03F 7/70283 (2013.01); G03F 7/70583 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0573281 A2 19931208; EP 0573281 A3 19940216; EP 0573281 B1 20000927; US 5465220 A 19951107; US 5607821 A 19970304; US 6045976 A 20000404; US 6420094 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100602

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-12-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING A LIGHT SOURCE PROFILE IN AN OPTICAL EXPOSURE APPARATUS AND OPTICAL EXPOSURE METHOD IN WHICH A LIGHT SOURCE PROFILE IS SET USING SUCH OPTIMIZATION METHOD, IN PARTICULAR WHERE THE LIGHT IS PROJECTED OBLIQUELY TOWARDS A MASK

1997-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970131

1994-10-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940809

1994-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1993-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT