Global Patent Index - EP 0576080 B1

EP 0576080 B1 2002-09-18 - Picture signal processing mode control

Title (en)

Picture signal processing mode control

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Steuern eines Bildsignalverarbeitungsmodus

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour commander un mode de traitement de signal d'image

Publication

EP 0576080 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93201752 A

Priority

  • EP 93201752 A
  • EP 92201895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0576080A2] In a method of controlling a picture signal processing mode, first and second motion vectors are determined (ME, DT) for first and second fields, and a picture signal processing mode control signal is obtained by comparing (DT, -, COMP-R) the first and second motion vectors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/14; H04N 7/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/14 (2006.01); H04N 7/01 (2006.01); H04N 7/015 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/145 (2013.01); H04N 7/0112 (2013.01); H04N 7/015 (2013.01); H04N 19/51 (2013.01); H04N 19/521 (2014.11)

Citation (examination)

US 4998287 A 19910305 - KATZNELSON RON D [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0576080 A2 19931229; EP 0576080 A3 19940622; EP 0576080 B1 20020918; EP 1217829 A2 20020626; EP 1217829 A3 20020821; EP 1217829 B1 20050907

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130619

2013-06-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69332298

2013-04-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NXP B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., GRAND CAYMAN, KY

- Document: DE 69332298

- Effective date: 20130304

2013-04-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69332298

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20130304

2013-03-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69332298

- Representative's name: EPPING HERMANN FISCHER, PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCH, DE

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110618

2012-05-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TRIDENT MICROSYSTEMS (FAR EAST) LTD., KY

- Effective date: 20120418

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-20 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

- Name of requester: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., NL

- Effective date: 20120305

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-03-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69332298

- Effective date: 20110426

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110618

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110618

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100709

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-06-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-01-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69332298 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1997-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961230

1995-02-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941222

1994-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN

1994-06-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1993-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT