Global patent index - EP 0576113 B1

EP 0576113 B1 2000-03-08 - Method and device for the guide generation of a safety print

Title (en)

Method and device for the guide generation of a safety print

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zur schnellen Erzeugung eines Sicherheitsabdruckes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la génération d'une impression de sécurité

Publication

EP 0576113 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93250183 A

Priority

DE 4221270 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0576113A2] In this method, quantities are provided by a control device (6) of the franking machine before a print request, with a) generation of a combination number (KOZ1), b) encryption of the combination number (KOZ1) into a crypto-number (KRZ1) and c) conversion of the crypto-number (KRZ1) into at least one row of marking symbols (MSR1) by means of a set (SSY1) of symbols. An unmistakeable machine readable and manually analysable marking is assembled column by column with the remaining variable data already embedded in the frame data during the printing of the entire franking machine pattern. The symbols are selected from the aspect of good distinguishability and the associated possibility of interpreting the image content of the symbol in speech. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/0033 (2013.01); G07B 17/00024 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00032 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00354 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00443 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0054 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00588 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00604 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00645 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00709 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0576113 A2 19931229; EP 0576113 A3 19941207; EP 0576113 B1 20000308; CA 2099206 A1 19931227; CA 2099206 C 19981027; DE 4221270 A1 19940105; DE 59310377 D1 20051006; EP 0578042 A2 19940112; EP 0578042 A3 19941207; EP 0578042 B1 19990519; EP 0902400 A2 19990317; EP 0902400 A3 20000913; EP 0902400 B1 20050810; EP 0907149 A2 19990407; EP 0907149 A3 20000913; EP 0907150 A2 19990407; EP 0907150 A3 20000913; EP 0907150 B1 20050831; US 5471925 A 19951205; US 5894792 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130622

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130620

2013-07-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20130620

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-06-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59309965

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120404

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59309965

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-13

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970612

1996-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-07-03 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1995-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950131

1994-12-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1994-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1993-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI