Global Patent Index - EP 0576438 B2

EP 0576438 B2 2002-09-18 - HIGH-PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE

Title (en)

HIGH-PRESSURE CLEANING DEVICE

Title (de)

HOCHDRUCKREINIGUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE A HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0576438 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 92904714 A

Priority

  • DE 4108775 A
  • EP 9200347 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5429306A] PCT No. PCT/EP92/00347 Sec. 371 Date Sep. 10, 1993 Sec. 102(e) Date Sep. 10, 1993 PCT Filed Feb. 19, 1992 PCT Pub. No. WO92/16313 PCT Pub. Date Oct. 1, 1992.In order, on the one hand, to be able to use a high-pressure cleaning device comprising a high-pressure pump, a liquid supply and a pressure line for the liquid supplied by the pump as well as a housing surrounding the pump, in the usual way as a portable device and on the other hand, however, to facilitate transport without increasing the overall dimensions, it is proposed that rollers be arranged on the underside of the housing in the area of a side edge and that a handle insertable into the housing be mounted therein, the handle being shiftable between an inserted position in the housing and an extended position and securable in both these positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02; B05B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/08 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B05B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 9/007 (2013.01); B08B 3/026 (2013.01); B08B 2203/0211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5429306 A 19950704; AT 129442 T 19951115; DE 4108775 A1 19920924; DE 59204143 D1 19951130; DE 9104335 U1 19910718; DK 0576438 T3 19951204; DK 0576438 T4 20021125; EP 0576438 A1 19940105; EP 0576438 B1 19951025; EP 0576438 B2 20020918; WO 9216313 A2 19921001; WO 9216313 A3 19921112

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090219

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19960229

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070219

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070219

2006-03-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-02-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-11-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-10-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2004-01-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-04-18 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2002-12-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021229

2002-11-25 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2002-11-06 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-09-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

1998-07-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ELEKTRA BECKUM AG * 960723 ALFRED GRAF KG * 960722

- Effective date: 19960707

1996-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1996-09-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ELEKTRA BECKUM AG * 960723 ALFRED GRAF KG * 960722

- Effective date: 19960707

1996-09-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ELEKTRA BECKUM AG

- Effective date: 19960717

1996-09-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ALFRED GRAF KG

- Effective date: 19960723

1996-09-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INTERPUMP SPA

- Effective date: 19960722

1996-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1996-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 19960229

1996-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 19960229

1996-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1996-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Effective date: 19960219

1996-01-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Effective date: 19960125

1996-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19951127

1995-12-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1995-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59204143 19951130

1995-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1995-10-25 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Effective date: 19951025

1995-10-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19951025

1995-10-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19951025

1995-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 129442 T 19951115

1995-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1995-02-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19941222

1994-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19930806

1994-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE