Global patent index - EP 0577017 B1

EP 0577017 B1 2001-03-07 - Device and method for testing the dynamic behaviour of guns

Title (en)

Device and method for testing the dynamic behaviour of guns

Title (de)

Gerät und Verfahren zum Testen des dynamischen Verhaltens von Rohrwaffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour tester le comportement dynamique de canons

Publication

EP 0577017 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93110165 A

Priority

DE 9208660 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0577017A1] An apparatus is specified for testing the dynamic behaviour, especially the aiming accuracy, of guns (tube weapons), which apparatus contains a video camera (10) and a video reproduction device (20), which is portable or can be inserted in a rack, for reproducing the image (video) supplied by the video camera. The video camera is mounted on or in the barrel (1) of a gun in such a manner that the optical axis (3) of the video camera corresponds very precisely with the bore axis (3) of the barrel (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 31/02; F41G 3/32; G01B 11/00; G01C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 31/02 (2006.01); F41G 1/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 1/54 (2013.01); F41A 31/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0314721 B1 19930908

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9208660 U1 19920924; EP 0577017 A1 19940105; EP 0577017 B1 20010307

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-07-03 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-06-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59310151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120614

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-08-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: THALES NEDERLAND B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310151

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-12

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL SE

2000-07-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE DYNAMIC BEHAVIOUR OF GUNS

2000-05-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE DYNAMIC BEHAVIOUR OF GUNS

2000-04-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE DYNAMIC BEHAVIOUR OF GUNS

1999-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-05-07 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 19961201

1997-05-07 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 19970828

1995-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19951013

1994-08-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940613

1994-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE NL SE