Global Patent Index - EP 0577027 B1

EP 0577027 B1 2000-08-23 - Combination of silver halide photographic material and radiographic intensifying screens

Title (en)

Combination of silver halide photographic material and radiographic intensifying screens

Title (de)

Kombination von photographischen Silberhalogenidmaterial und radiographischen Verstärkerschirmen

Title (fr)

Combinaison de matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent et d'écrans renforçateurs radiographiques

Publication

EP 0577027 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93110212 A

Priority

  • JP 19343292 A
  • JP 19343392 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0577027A1] An improved combination for forming a radiographic image comprises an intensifying screen which is high-sensitive and shows high contrast transfer function values and a silver halide photographic material having a specifically defined sensitivity: that is, 0.010-0.035 lux.second of exposure dose is required to obtain an image having a density of 0.5 more than the minimum density on its photosensitive layer: the density is determined by the steps of exposing the photosensitive layer to monochromatic light of which wavelength is the same as the main emission wavelength of the above intensifying screen and of which half width is 15+/-5 nm, developing at 35 DEG C for 25 seconds in the specified developing solution, removing the photosensitive layer on the side reverse to the exposed side and then measuring the density of the remaining photosensitive layer. Another combination based on the analogous concept is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/17 (2006.01); G21K 4/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/17 (2013.01); G21K 4/00 (2013.01); G03C 2200/58 (2013.01); G21K 2004/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0401709 A2 19901212 - FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0577027 A1 19940105; EP 0577027 B1 20000823; DE 69329262 D1 20000928; DE 69329262 T2 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-06-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *FUJI PHOTO FILM CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-06-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69329262

2013-06-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69329262

2012-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-09-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329262 20000928

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

1997-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970609

1994-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940203

1994-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR