Global Patent Index - EP 0577192 B1

EP 0577192 B1 2000-08-09 - Photographic element comprising a dir coupler and a barc coupler containing an acid solubilizing group

Title (en)

Photographic element comprising a dir coupler and a barc coupler containing an acid solubilizing group

Title (de)

Photographisches Element enthaltend einen DIR-Kuppler und einen eine Säure löslichmachende Gruppe enthaltenden Bleich- beschleuniger freisetzenden Kuppler

Title (fr)

Elément photographique comprenant un copulant DIR et un copulant libérant accélérateur de blanchiment comprenant un groupe acide solubilisant

Publication

EP 0577192 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93201812 A

Priority

US 90624792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0577192A1] A color photographic element comprises a support bearing at least one photographic silver halide emulsion layer, an image dye-forming coupler, and a combination of a development inhibitor releasing coupler and a wash-out coupler,the washout coupler (A) (i) capable of forming a compound that is washed out of the photographic element upon processing and (ii) capable of releasing a bleach accelerator group, and (iii) is represented by the formula: (SOL)x-COUP-(R<1>)y-BLEACH The development inhibitor releasing coupler is selected from a timed and non-timed development inhibitor releasing coupler.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/305

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/305 (2006.01); G03C 7/32 (2006.01); G03C 7/407 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/30541 (2013.01); G03C 7/30576 (2013.01); G03C 7/30594 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0577192 A1 19940105; EP 0577192 B1 20000809; DE 69329172 D1 20000914; DE 69329172 T2 20010405; JP H0659413 A 19940304

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2002-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010623

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010623

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329172 20000914

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970829

1994-08-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940608

1994-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL