Global Patent Index - EP 0578957 B1

EP 0578957 B1 2000-08-30 - Process for applying a decorative layer to a support material

Title (en)

Process for applying a decorative layer to a support material

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Auftragen einer dekorativen Schicht auf ein Trägermaterial

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'application d'une couche décorative sur un matériau support

Publication

EP 0578957 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93108914 A

Priority

DE 4219446 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0578957A2] In a process for applying a decorative layer consisting of a radiation-curable coating compound, especially of lacquer, adhesive, glue or a mixture of the abovementioned substances or some thereof, to a support plate and/or a web-shaped substrate, the decorative layer being exposed to a high-energy radiation, especially UV radiation, X-ray radiation, laser radiation and/or electron radiation, a particular temperature being maintained at atmospheric pressure, and thereby being cross-linked and/or polymerised, until the decorative layer has achieved a desired hardness, provision is made for the decorative layer which is to be hardened to be masked, in order to provide protection against the action of oxygen, on one side by the support plate forming the substrate and on the other side by a film, for example a carrier film, for the irradiation of the decorative layer to be carried out with a high-energy radiation in an atmosphere free of inert gases, and for a pressure equivalent to atmospheric pressure to be set and to be maintained during the period of action of the high-energy radiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 5/04; B32B 27/00; B32B 27/04; B32B 31/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/06 (2006.01); B32B 27/00 (2006.01); B32B 27/04 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/068 (2013.01); B05D 3/061 (2013.01); B44C 5/0415 (2013.01); B44C 5/043 (2013.01); B44C 5/0469 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0578957 A2 19940119; EP 0578957 A3 19940810; EP 0578957 B1 20000830; AT 195909 T 20000915; DE 4219446 A1 19931216; DE 4219446 C2 19950518; DE 4219446 C3 20010118; DE 59310094 D1 20001005; DK 0578957 T3 20010102; ES 2152236 T3 20010201; PT 578957 E 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2006-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-10-29 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20040907

2004-10-26 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2004-09-01 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-09-01 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20040217

2003-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-18 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TRESPA INTERNATIONAL B.V.

2001-07-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRESPA INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152236 T3

2001-01-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-11-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310094 20001005

2000-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195909 T 20000915

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951016

1995-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951016

1995-11-15 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1994-11-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940913

1994-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1994-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE